Dyer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tommie Dyer
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00310
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/29/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
July 26, 2022 Filing 18 JURY DEMAND by Tommie Dyer (Smolen, Donald)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Tommie Dyer [Note: Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Tommie Dyer(pty:pla).] (Bailey, Hunter)
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Tommie Dyer [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Tommie Dyer(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence)
July 26, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Tommie Dyer (Hamilton, Laura)
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Tommie Dyer (Smolen, Donald)
July 25, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 21, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Conrad Purdom, III on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Raymond Conrad Purdom, III added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Purdom, Raymond)
July 20, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning case due to conflict, recusing Judge Claire V Eagan. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 22-cr-00310-TCK-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE To Parties of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Creek County District Court, case number CJ-2022-45 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2643788) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (With attachments) (Gladd, John)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John) Modified on 7/18/2022 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - counsel directed to refile document (sc, Dpty Clk).
March 7, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Tommie Dyer (lmt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommie Dyer
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: John William Warren
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Hunter Keith Bailey
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Scott Gladd
Represented By: Raymond Conrad Purdom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?