Brock et al v. CSAA Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Deric Brock and Jennifer Brock
Defendant: CSAA Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00326
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): before ASJ Nora R. O'Neill (her office) ( Settlement Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 09:30 AM before Adjunct Settlement Judge) (LML, Chambers)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2022, Discovery due by 12/5/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers)
August 16, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Hefner, Joshua)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua Kyle Hefner on behalf of CSAA Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Joshua Kyle Hefner added to party CSAA Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Hefner, Joshua)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/16/2022) (JFH1, Chambers)
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Kane, Matthew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice to Interested Parties (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Kane, Matthew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CSAA Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerard F Pignato on behalf of CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Pignato, Gerard)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Colin Kane on behalf of CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Kane, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CSAA Insurance Exchange for CSAA Fire and Casualty Company) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Kane, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Rogers County, case number CJ-2022-211 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2647178) by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Kane, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by CSAA Fire and Casualty Company (Kane, Matthew)
June 9, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against CSAA Fire and Casualty Company by Jennifer Brock, Deric Brock (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock et al v. CSAA Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deric Brock
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brock
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Gerard F Pignato
Represented By: Matthew Colin Kane
Represented By: Joshua Kyle Hefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?