The Ledge, LLC
Debtor: The Ledge, LLC
Us Trustee: United States Trustee
Case Number: 5:2021bk13058
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Sarah A Hall
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 20 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2021 Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
December 21, 2021 Filing 19 Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtors representative appeared, was examined and meeting concluded. Creditor committee has not been appointed.. Appearances: See Attachment . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appearances)(Tate, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2021 Filing 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#17 Order on Motion to Employ Attorney) No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 12/17/2021. (Admin.)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting Motion/Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #7) Involvement of O. Clifton Gooding for The Ledge, LLC added to case. Signed by Judge Hall. Time signed: 10:41 cc: Matrix Service by sboa Date: 12/15/2021 (sboa, ca)
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 Initial Report of Debtor in Possession Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
December 1, 2021 Case Verified. (sboa, ca)
December 1, 2021 Court Correction Advisory: Docket Entry 15 Schedules: The PDF also includes a Declaration. (sboa, ca)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 Schedules: Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual, Schedule D: Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Non-Individual, Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases - Non-Individual, Schedule H: Codebtors - Non-Individual, Includes A Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities (non-individuals), Includes Statement of Your Financial Affairs (non-individual) Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
November 25, 2021 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#10 Order to Set Claims Bar Date) No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 11/25/2021. (Admin.)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#6 Notice to Set Meeting (chp 11 & 13) (multi)) No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 11/24/2021. (Admin.)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Service Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC (RE: related document(s)#10 Order to Set Claims Bar Date, #11 Notice of Claims Bar Date). (Gooding, O.)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Claims Bar Date. Last date to file Proof of Claims: December 27, 2021 4:00 pm CST Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Granting Motion to Set Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #8) Signed by Judge Hall. Time signed: 14:53 cc: Matrix Service by sboa Date: 11/23/2021 Proofs of Claims due 12/27/2021. (sboa, ca)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeffrey E Tate of Department of Justice, US Trustee on behalf of United States Trustee. (Tate, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Application to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claims Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Employ O. Clifton Gooding; Mark B. Toffoli; Angela N. Stuteville as Attorney for Debtor. with Affidavit With Certificate of Service, With Notice and Opportunity for Hearing, Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification #2 Matrix) (Gooding, O.)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 Notice by AUST to Set Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2021 at 01:30 PM Telephonically. (dcus, ca)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Notice by AUST of Date of Meeting of Creditors . (dcus, ca)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Margaret M Sine of Crowe & Dunlevy on behalf of BancCentral, National Association. (Sine, Margaret)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Gary A. Bryant of Crowe & Dunlevy, PC on behalf of BancCentral, National Association. (Bryant, Gary)
November 19, 2021 The Full Filing Fee of $1738.00 was not paid at case filing. . (snet, ca)
November 19, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-13058) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8587813. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
November 19, 2021 Case Verified. Missing Documents Due. All Required Schedules due 12/2/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/2/2021. Declaration of Schedules due 12/2/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/2/2021. (sboa, ca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of The Ledge, LLC. (Gooding, O.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738 . Filed by The Ledge, LLC Attorney Signature Exhibit B due 12/2/2021. Statistical Summary due 12/2/2021. All Required Schedules due 12/2/2021. Schedule A/B due 12/2/2021. Schedule C due 12/2/2021. Schedule D due 12/2/2021. Schedule E/F due 12/2/2021. Schedule G due 12/2/2021. Schedule H due 12/2/2021. Schedule I due 12/2/2021. Schedule J due 12/2/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/2/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/2/2021. Incomplete Filings due 12/2/2021. Chapter 11 Plan due 03/18/2022. Disclosure Statement due 03/18/2022. Government Proof of Claim due 05/17/2022. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/18/2021. Ownership Statement of Business due 11/18/2021. (Gooding, O.)

Search for this case: The Ledge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: The Ledge, LLC
Represented By: O. Clifton Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Jeffrey E Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?