CDL University, LLC
Debtor: CDL University, LLC
Us Trustee: United States Trustee
Trustee: Stephen J. Moriarty
Case Number: 5:2022bk11257
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Janice D Loyd
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Court Correction Advisory: - Docket entry 27 Status Report. The PDF contains one (or more) page that is blank. However, the document appears to be complete. The blank page appears to be errata. The filing attorney is advised to review the document to ensure that it is complete and accurate. (sboa, ca)
August 3, 2022 Filing 27 Status Report for Pre Status Conference with Certificate of Service Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hammond, Gary)
July 21, 2022 Filing 26 Monthly Operating Report for June 2022 Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Hammond, Gary)
July 15, 2022 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#23 Order on Motion to Employ Attorney) No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 07/15/2022. (Admin.)
July 14, 2022 Filing 24 Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtors representative appeared, was examined and meeting concluded. Creditor committee has not been appointed.. Appearances: See Attached . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appearances)(Tate, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting Motion/Application to Employ Attorney (Related Doc #9) Involvement of Hammond Law Firm for CDL University, LLC added to case. Signed by Judge Loyd. Time signed: 11:33 cc: mtx Service by je Date: 7/13/2022 (jebe, ca)
July 13, 2022 Filing 22 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting Continued to 7/14/2022 at 01:30 PM Telephonically. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appearances)(Tate, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2022 Corrective Entry Satisfied Entry 20 (jebe, ca)
July 2, 2022 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#19 Hearing Docket - bk) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/02/2022. (Admin.)
July 1, 2022 Filing 20 Amended Initial Report of Debtor in Possession Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Initial Report)(Hammond, Gary)
July 1, 2022 Corrective Entry - Correction needed on docket entry 18 Initial Report of Debtor in Possession. Pleading was not signed personally or electronically by the Attorney. Please file an amended pleading that includes the personal or electronic signature of the Attorney. Use the original event and select Amended from the Dropdown Box. Signature of Attorney must contain the complete signature block. If the correction is not made by the close of business on 7/5/2022 the entry will be stricken. (dwebs, ca)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 Corrected Status Conference Scheduled With Judge Loyd cc: Hammond, Moriarty, Tate Service By: dr Date of Service: 06/30/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor CDL University, LLC) Status conference to be held on 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonically. (Drohde)
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 Initial Report of Debtor in Possession Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Hammond, Gary)
June 18, 2022 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order to Set Claims Bar Date) No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 06/18/2022. (Admin.)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#10 Hearing Docket - bk) No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/17/2022. (Admin.)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting Motion to Set Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #11) Signed by Judge Loyd. Time signed: 8:58 cc: matrix Service by ao Date: 6/16/22 Proofs of Claims due 7/20/2022. Government Proof of Claim due 12/15/2022. (aowen, ca)
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by Lorena M Laks of Oklahoma Tax Commission on behalf of Oklahoma Tax Commission. (Laks, Lorena)
June 15, 2022 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#6 Notice to Set Meeting Chapter 11 SubV Corp) No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 06/15/2022. (Admin.)
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by James W. Vogt of Reynolds,Ridings,Vogt & McCart, PLLC on behalf of Atlas Financial Group LLC. (Vogt, James)
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 Application to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claims With Brief in Support, With Certificate of Service, Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hammond, Gary)
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 Status Conference Scheduled With Judge Loyd cc: Hammond, Tate, Moriarty Service By: dr Date of Service: 06/14/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor CDL University, LLC) Status conference to be held on 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM at 2nd Floor Courtroom, 215 Dean A. McGee Avenue, Oklahoma City, OK. (Drohde)
June 15, 2022 Case Verified. (jebe, ca)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to Employ Gary D. Hammond as Attorney for Debtor. with Affidavit With Certificate of Service, With Notice and Opportunity for Hearing, Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hammond, Gary)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 Small Business Tax Returns , Small Business Balance Sheet , Cash Flow Statement for Small Business, Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Attachment)(Hammond, Gary)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 For Chapter 11 Non-Individual Case: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders. Filed by Gary D. Hammond on behalf of CDL University, LLC. (Attachments: #1 List of 20 Largest Creditors) (Hammond, Gary)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Notice by AUST to Set Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Telephonically. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability 9/12/2022. (snet, ca)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Notice by AUST of Date of Meeting of Creditors . (snet, ca)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR: Notice by AUST to Set Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/12/2022 at 01:30 PM Telephonically. (snet, ca) Modified on 6/13/2022 to show entered in error (snet, ca).
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee)(Tate, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeffrey E Tate of Department of Justice, US Trustee on behalf of United States Trustee. (Tate, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2022 Case Verified. (jebe, ca)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738 . Filed by CDL University, LLC 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 06/24/2022. Incomplete Filings due 06/24/2022. (Hammond, Gary)
June 10, 2022 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-11257) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8757535. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: CDL University, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CDL University, LLC
Represented By: Gary D. Hammond
Represented By: Hammond Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Jeffrey E Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stephen J. Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?