Pope v. Carns et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Neil Pope
Defendant: Edwin Carns, Lindsey Municipal Hospital and Dr Magness
Case Number: 5:2007cv01331
Filed: November 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Comanche
Presiding Judge: Doyle W. Argo
Presiding Judge: Stephen P. Friot
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING 102 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING 96 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lindsey Municipal Hospital, with respect to plaintiff's federal claims against Lindsey Municipal Hospital, DISMISSING without prejudice any claims by plaintiff under state law, DENYING 101 Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Lloyd Neil Pope, DENYING 99 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Lloyd Neil Pope, DENYING 100 Motion to Stay Case filed by Lloyd Neil Pope. This order disposes of all claims remaining in this action. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/28/09. (llg)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is recommended that that the motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment of Defendant Lindsay Municipal Hospital 96 with regard to Plaintiff's federal claims be GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff is raising any cla ims under State law, those claims should be dismissed without prejudice. It is further recommended that Plaintiff's motion to show cause 101 , construed as a motion for preliminary injunction, his motion for appointment of counsel 99 and his motion to stay 100 be DENIED.Objections to R&R due by 10/12/2009 This R&R disposes of all issues referred.Signed by Magistrate Judge Doyle W. Argo on 9/21/2009. (bc)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING 89 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING 81 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dr Magness, DENYING 82 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lloyd Neil Pope. This order does not dispose of all of the issues referred to the Magistrate Judge, and this matter remains referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 6/9/09. (llg)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the "Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction" by Dr. Steven Magness [Doc. No. 81] be granted, and that Plaintiff's "Motion Requesting Defaul t Judgment on Dr. Steven Magness" [Doc. No. 82] be denied. plaintiff's "Motion for Appointment of Counsel" [Doc. No.84] and Plaintiff's "Motion for Status Report" [Doc. No. 87] are hereby denied. The parties are adv ised of their right to file an objection to this Report and Recommendation with the Clerk of this Court by April 20, 2009; This Report and Recommendation does not dispose of all the issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doyle W. Argo on 3/30/09. (sr, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Documents #76 and #79 are each Denied. This action remains referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/11/09. (cjs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope v. Carns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Neil Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Carns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Municipal Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?