Nelson v. Parker

Plaintiff: Paul Nelson
Defendant: David Parker
Case Number: 5:2011cv00636
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Bana Roberts
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 21 Report and Recommendation.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/27/2011. (mb, )
August 3, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 10 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/3/2011. (mb, )
June 7, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay, transferring case to the Western District of Oklahoma (terminates case) (acg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 6/7/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?