Wilmes vs Halliburton et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Alan Wilmes and Lyn Marie Wilmes
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc, Halliburton Industrial Services Division and Halliburton Services
Case Number: 5:2011cv01323
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Stephens
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 126 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on the "Bodily or Personal Injury" Claims (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/31/2015. (ks)
August 10, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 plaintiffs' Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Appraiser, Jerry Dent (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/10/2015. (ks)
July 31, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit Testimony from Defendant's Appraiser, Robert Grace (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/31/2015. (ks)
July 27, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Proclude Expert Testimony of Defendant's Witness, Herschel Roberts, as set forth in the Order. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 07/27/15. (jy)
July 23, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Proclude Expert Testimony of Defendant's Witness, Ron Jarman. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 07/23/15. (jy)
July 22, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 HESI's Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Kevin J. Boyle. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 07/22/15. (jy)
July 2, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion and Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Show Legally Cognizable Injury (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/2/2015. (ks)
June 10, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on the Emotional Distress and/or Mental Anguish Claims of All Plaintiffs in the Above-Captioned Cases Except Plaintiffs Gilley, F. Herndon, M. Herndon, Pace, and L. Wilmes (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/10/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmes vs Halliburton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Alan Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyn Marie Wilmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Industrial Services Division
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Services
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?