City of Oklahoma City v. 100 foot wide permanent easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines et al
Plaintiff: City of Oklahoma City and Oklahoma City City of
Defendant: 100 foot wide permanent easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines, Brian Clinton Walker, Michael F Murdock, Catherine J Walker, Joan P Murdock, Marla J Walker, James Leon Walker, Ramona Kay Walker, Gloria Murdock Foster, Loretta M Gibson Walker, Forrest Neil Walker, John Russell Murdock, United States of America, Tawana Elaine Murdock Greenfield, Bryan Clinton Walker, Danielle Renee Riley, Willard Walker, Jr, Lela Jolene Walker, Eric David Murdock, Michael Todd Pumpkinseed Murdock, Joan O Murdock, Francene Murdock Wolfe, Maria Jean Walker, Marquetta Murdock, Ray M Murdock, Jeanna Marie Smith, Catherine Joy Walker Gibson, Valerian Dawn Riley, Henry Bentley Walker, Jr, Mary Bentley Walker Factor, Carolyn Murdock Hanratanagorn, Gail Lynn Murdock Depue, Glenda Sue Martinez Deer, Amy Diahanna Factor, Marla Jean Walker, Jessi Nitake Fochick Fillmore, Jason Kyle Murdock, Steven Allen Murdock, Kimberly Marie Walker, Marla J White, Anna Marie Pelts Woods, Gerald N Murdock, Karen Jo Roubidoux, Joan Murdock Hughes, Cortney Bentley Factor and Mary Dora Walker Kaskuske
Case Number: 5:2015cv00275
Filed: March 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 41 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Oklahoma City City of. (Kempf, John)
December 13, 2019 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsay N Kistler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kistler, Lindsay)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 CIVIL SCHEDULING DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 @ 10:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 12/30/2019. (nv)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 the joint motion to reopen administratively closed case to effectuate global settlement...this case is REOPENED and is set on the court's 01/2020 status conference docket. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/02/2019. (lam)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/26/2019. (mb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 36 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. By direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/2019. (sr)
November 13, 2019 Filing 35 JOINT MOTION to Reopen Case To Effectuate Global Settlement And, If Necessary, Assign a District Judge for Further Proceedings by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
November 29, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE (other) by United States of America re #32 Order Lifting Stay, Administrative Closing Order, Terminate Motions,,, (Second Joint Status Report) (Majors, Tom)
May 30, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE (other) by All Defendants re #32 Order Lifting Stay, Administrative Closing Order, Terminate Motions,,, Joint Status Report No. 1 (Majors, Tom)
November 29, 2016 Filing 32 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER granting #31 the parties' Joint Motion for Administrative Closing of Case While the Parties Continue to Explore Possible Global Settlement (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/29/2016. (ks)
November 23, 2016 Filing 31 JOINT MOTION for Administrative Closure by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 the parties' Joint Motion for Fifth Stay of Case for an Additional Sixty (60) Days and staying all proceedings in this case until November 23, 2016. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/26/2016. (ks)
September 23, 2016 Filing 29 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case for 60 Days While Parties Explore Global Settlement by Oklahoma City City of. (Kempf, John)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER the Court GRANTS the parties Joint Motion for Fourth Stay of Case for an Additional Sixty (60) Days While the Parties Continue to Explore Possible Global Settlement docket no. #27 and STAYS all proceedings in this case until September 23, 2016, in order for the parties to continue to explore a possible settlement in this matter. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/26/16. (pw)
July 25, 2016 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case for an additional 60 days (Fourth Request) by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 the parties' Joint Motion for Third Stay of Case for an Additional Sixty Two (62) Days While the Parties Continue to Explore Possible Global Settlement and STAYING all proceedings in this case until July 25, 2016, in order for the parties to continue to explore a possible settlement in this matter. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/25/2016. (ks)
May 24, 2016 Filing 25 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case (for an additonal 62 days (Third Stay Request)) by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Case for an Additional 60 Days While the Parties Continue to Explore Possible Global Settlement and staying all proceedings in this case for an additional sixty (60) days in order for the parties to continue to explore a possible settlement in this matter. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/25/2016. (ks)
March 24, 2016 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Extending Stay granted at Doc. 22) for and Additional 60 Days by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 the parties' joint motion to stay case and STAYING all proceedings in this case for 60 days. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/25/2016. (ks)
January 21, 2016 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case For 60 Days So Global Settlement May Be Explored by United States of America. (Majors, Tom)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange for all further proceedings. Honorable Tim Leonard no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 08/06/15. (jy)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 08/06/15. (jy)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conferences held in this case and related cases CIV-15-273-L and CIV-15-274-L. In Case No. CIV-15-274-L, defendant USA is directed to file a motion to dismiss on jurisdictional grounds within 30 days. Plaintiff to respond within 20 days thereafter and reply due within 7 days after the plaintiffs response has been filed. No other deadlines set in any of the cases at this time. After the court rules on the motion to dismiss, another status and scheduling conference will be scheduled.. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 08/06/15. (jy)
August 5, 2015 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 08/05/15. (jy)
August 3, 2015 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by City of Oklahoma City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order)(Kempf, John)
July 31, 2015 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff City of Oklahoma City. (Kempf, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 14 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2015 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Tim Leonard. Status Report due by 7/31/2015. (jy)
May 27, 2015 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Ownership names and Interests)(Majors, Tom)
April 15, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 5/27/2015. (jy)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion by Defendant United States for Extension of Time Until May 27, 2015 to Respond to Complaint for Condemnation. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 04/15/15. (jy)
April 14, 2015 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time Until May 27, 2015, to file Response to Complaints for Condemnation by Glenda Sue Martinez Deer, Gail Lynn Murdock Depue, Amy Diahanna Factor, Cortney Bentley Factor, Mary Bentley Walker Factor, Jessi Nitake Fochick Fillmore, Gloria Murdock Foster, Tawana Elaine Murdock Greenfield, Carolyn Murdock Hanratanagorn, Mary Dora Walker Kaskuske, Eric David Murdock, Gerald N Murdock, Jason Kyle Murdock, Joan P Murdock, John Russell Murdock, Marquetta Murdock, Michael F Murdock, Ray M Murdock, Steven Allen Murdock, Danielle Renee Riley, Valerian Dawn Riley, Karen Jo Roubidoux, Jeanna Marie Smith, United States of America, Brian Clinton Walker, Catherine J Walker, Forrest Neil Walker, Henry Bentley Walker, Jr, James Leon Walker, Kimberly Marie Walker, Lela Jolene Walker, Loretta M Gibson Walker, Marla J Walker, Ramona Kay Walker, Willard Walker, Jr, Francene Murdock Wolfe, Anna Marie Pelts Woods. (Majors, Tom)
April 14, 2015 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Tom Majors on behalf of Glenda Sue Martinez Deer, Gail Lynn Murdock Depue, Amy Diahanna Factor, Cortney Bentley Factor, Mary Bentley Walker Factor, Jessi Nitake Fochick Fillmore, Gloria Murdock Foster, Tawana Elaine Murdock Greenfield, Carolyn Murdock Hanratanagorn, Mary Dora Walker Kaskuske, Eric David Murdock, Gerald N Murdock, Jason Kyle Murdock, Joan P Murdock, John Russell Murdock, Marquetta Murdock, Michael F Murdock, Ray M Murdock, Steven Allen Murdock, Danielle Renee Riley, Valerian Dawn Riley, Karen Jo Roubidoux, Jeanna Marie Smith, United States of America, Brian Clinton Walker, Catherine J Walker, Forrest Neil Walker, Henry Bentley Walker, Jr, James Leon Walker, Kimberly Marie Walker, Lela Jolene Walker, Loretta M Gibson Walker, Marla J Walker, Ramona Kay Walker, Willard Walker, Jr, Francene Murdock Wolfe, Anna Marie Pelts Woods (Majors, Tom)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Service of Notice. Signed by Honorable Tim Leonard on 03/30/15. (jy)
March 30, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE in Condemnation (jy)
March 30, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE in Condemnation (jy)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Tim Leonard for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/25/2015. (ks)
March 23, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by City of Oklahoma City (Pomeroy, L)
March 23, 2015 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by City of Oklahoma City. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Map of Atoka Pipeline, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plat Survey)(Pomeroy, L)
March 19, 2015 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John F Kempf, Jr on behalf of City of Oklahoma City (Kempf, John)
March 19, 2015 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by L David Pomeroy on behalf of City of Oklahoma City (Pomeroy, L)
March 19, 2015 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2037874. (Pomeroy, L)
March 18, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by City of Oklahoma City. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (njr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2015: #2 Exhibit 1 - Notice in Condemnation, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice in Condemnation Unknown owners) (pw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Oklahoma City v. 100 foot wide permanent easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100 foot wide permanent easement and right-of-way for public utility water pipelines
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Clinton Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine J Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan P Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla J Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leon Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Kay Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Murdock Foster
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta M Gibson Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Neil Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Russell Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawana Elaine Murdock Greenfield
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Clinton Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Renee Riley
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard Walker, Jr
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lela Jolene Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric David Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Todd Pumpkinseed Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan O Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francene Murdock Wolfe
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Jean Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquetta Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray M Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanna Marie Smith
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Joy Walker Gibson
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerian Dawn Riley
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Bentley Walker, Jr
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Bentley Walker Factor
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Murdock Hanratanagorn
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Lynn Murdock Depue
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Sue Martinez Deer
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Diahanna Factor
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Jean Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Nitake Fochick Fillmore
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kyle Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Allen Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Marie Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla J White
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Marie Pelts Woods
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald N Murdock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Jo Roubidoux
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Murdock Hughes
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortney Bentley Factor
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Dora Walker Kaskuske
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Oklahoma City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma City City of
Represented By: Lindsay N Kistler
Represented By: L David Pomeroy
Represented By: John F Kempf, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?