Chichakli v. Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ammar Chichakli
Defendant: Charles E Samuels, Jr, Stacia A Hylton, Shane Wyatt and Mike Lennier
Case Number: 5:2015cv00687
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Presiding Judge: Shon T. Erwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and reserved in part 160 Defendants' Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/30/2018. (mb)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/9/2018. (mb)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER adopting 122 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Summary Judgment as more fully set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/4/17. (ml)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER adopting 121 Report and Recommendation;granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment as more fully set out in order; denying 91 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/27/17. (ml)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 58 Motion to Amend Complaint; adopting 63 Report and Recommendation. Case Re-Referred to Magistrate Jones. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 08/12/2016. (jb)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 37 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 55 Report and Recommendation. Case Re-Referred to Magistrate Jones. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/11/2016. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chichakli v. Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ammar Chichakli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Samuels, Jr
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacia A Hylton
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Wyatt
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lennier
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?