Coleman v. Reed et al
Plaintiff: Steven M Coleman
Defendant: Donald William Reed, Sun West Mud Company and West Texas Insurance Exchange Inc
Case Number: 5:2015cv01014
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 108 defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/1/2017. (ks)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 67 third-party defendant Universal Specialized, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatory Responses of Defendant Sunwest Mud Company, Inc. (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/12/2017. (ks)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 plaintiff/counter-defendant Steven M. Coleman's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/22/2016. (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Coleman
Represented By: James B Buxton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald William Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun West Mud Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Texas Insurance Exchange Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?