Tarver et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Tarver, Harry Tarver and Tammy Tarver
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv00548
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the Court(text only) re #82 Notice of Subpoena. All filings in this case should reflect Judge Scott L. Palk as the assigned Judge utilizing "SLP" at the end of the case number. You were advised of this change in the Order entered November 27, 2017. Future filings that are incorrect will be stricken. (ac)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company to Allstate Insurance (Richardson, Andrew)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #80 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/28/2018. (md)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/3/2018. Motions due by 11/1/2018. Jury Trial set for 1/8/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Pretrial Report due by 12/10/2018. (md)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time by 90 Days by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3rd Amended Scheduling Order)(Robinson, Jason)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Unavailability (Robinson, Jason)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the Court(text only) #79 Notice. All filings in this case should reflect Judge Scott L. Palk as the assigned Judge utilizing "SLP" at the end of the case number. You were advised of this change in the Order entered November 27, 2017. Future filings that are incorrect will be stricken. (ac)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time of Expert Deadlines. Plaintiffs' to file final list of expert witnesses and submit expert reports to Defendant by March 2, 2018. Defendant to file final list of expert witnesses and submit expert reports to Plaintiffs by April 2, 2018. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/29/2018. (md)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time Agreed Motion for Extension of Expert Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENTRY of Appearance by Harold C Zuckerman on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Zuckerman, Harold)
December 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Pursuant to #74 Jury Trial termainted (md)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/27/17. (ml)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Agreed Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/20/2017. (mb)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/17/2018. Motions due by 9/14/2018. Pretrial Report due by 10/1/2018. (mb)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed 2nd Am. S.O.)(Richardson, Andrew)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AGREED SHARING AND NON-SHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/30/2017. (mb)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Stipulated Sharing & Non-Sharing Protective Order)(Richardson, Andrew)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A McVicker on behalf of Ford Motor Company (McVicker, Jason)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel N Aizenman terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/2/2017. (mb)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel Aizenman by Ford Motor Company. (Aizenman, Daniel)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #62 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/16/2017. (mb)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Thefollowing deadlines set by the #55 Amended Scheduling Order are amended as follows:Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 11/29/17; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 12/29/17; Pla witness list due 1/16/18; Dft witness list due 1/30/18; Pla exhibit list due 5/7/18; Dft exhibit list due 5/21/18; Motions in limine, Voir dire requests due 7/20/18; Jury instructions, Trial briefs due 7/26/18; Discovery due by 6/14/2018, Motions due by 7/12/2018., Pretrial Report due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/1/17. (ml)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Robinson, Jason)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #62 MOTION for Reconsideration re #51 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,, and Brief in Support filed by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Reconsideration re #51 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,, and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re #51 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,, and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Bristol Myers Scribb Co)(Richardson, Andrew)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company to Department of Public Safety (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Richardson, Andrew)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AGREED ORDER granting #59 Joint Motion for Writ of Assistance. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/10/2017. (mb)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JOINT MOTION for Writ of Assistance Pursuant to 63 O.S. 2011 by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying #53 Motion to Certify and Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or in the Alternatively to Reconsider. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/10/2017. (mb)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, Stay or Reconsider filed by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, Stay or Reconsider filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 4/3/2017; Motions to amend due 6/1/2017; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/1/2017; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/1/2017; Pla witness list due 9/18/2017; Pla exhibit list due 1/5/2018; Motions in limine due 3/22/2018; Jury instructions due 3/22/2018; Voir dire requests due 3/22/2018; Discovery due by 2/15/2018. Jury Trial set for 4/10/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 3/15/2015. Pretrial Report due by 3/29/2018.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/4/2017. (mb)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FIRST MOTION for Order for Entry of Agreed Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Robinson, Jason)
January 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Certify Interlocutory Appeal, Stay or Reconsider by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Ford Motor Company.(Richardson, Andrew)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ford Motor Company; granting #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TRW Vehicle Safety System Inc's; finding as moot #19 Motion for Discovery; denying #21 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/5/2016. (mb)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti: Status/Scheduling Conference held on 12/1/2016. Parties to submit an agreed scheduling order no later than 12/10/2016 (mb)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Harry Tarver, Harry Tarver, Tammy Tarver, Tammy Tarver. (Robinson, Jason)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #44 Second Motion to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/14/2016. (mb)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #44 Second Motion to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/10/2016. ORDER ENTERED IN ERROR(mb) Modified on 11/10/2016 (mb).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation: Disregard #47 Order was entered in error. Subsequent Order to issue. (mb)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel N Aizenman on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Aizenman, Daniel)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 SECOND MOTION to Supplement its Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt from www.showroom.ford.com, #2 Exhibit Truhlar v. Alvarez, et al.)(Robinson, Jason)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SECOND MOTION to Supplement its Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2016 03:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 11/28/2016. (jb)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #40 Motion to File Response to Supplemental Brief. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/14/2016. (mb)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Supplement to Motion to Dismiss, Doc. No. 10 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Erwin v FMC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Magill v FMC)(Quinn-Cooper, Mary) Modified on 11/21/2016 (mb). Modified on 11/21/2016 (mb).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Supplement to File Response to Ford's Supplemental Brief by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/7/2016. (mb)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #31 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response Brief. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/19/2016. (mb)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Supplement Response to Ford's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docs. 10, 18)) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Supplement Response to Ford's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docs. 10, 18)) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew E Coveler on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc (Coveler, Matthew)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily J Bogenschutz on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc (Bogenschutz, Emily)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Supplement Response to Ford's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Docs. 10, 18)) by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for Discovery upon TRW Regarding Jurisdictional Facts filed by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Treas, Haylie)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Coveler. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/28/2016. (mb)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James A. Jennings. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/28/2016. (mb)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Coveler Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2308167 by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Jennings, James)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily J. Bogenschutz Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2308118 by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Jennings, James)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Discovery upon Ford Motor Company Regarding Jurisdictional Facts filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Discovery upon Ford Motor Company Regarding Jurisdictional Facts filed by Ford Motor Company. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Ford Motor Company. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opening Brief in Support filed by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Treas, Haylie)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Discovery upon TRW Regarding Jurisdictional Facts by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Jason)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opening Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brockman v. AHMC Trial Court Order, #2 Exhibit TRW 2013 Annual Report Excerpts)(Robinson, Jason)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Discovery upon Ford Motor Company Regarding Jurisdictional Facts by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Requests)(Robinson, Jason)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ford's 2015 Annual Report Excerpts, #2 Exhibit List of Oklahoma Ford Dealerships, #3 Exhibit Fred Jones Bio, #4 Exhibit Ford's Filing History w/OK Sec. of St., #5 Exhibit OSCN Search Results - Ford as Plaintiff - OK Co., #6 Exhibit OSCN Search Results - Ford as Plaintiff - Tulsa Co., #7 Exhibit South Carolina Trial Court Order, #8 Exhibit St. ex rel. Ford v. McGraw, #9 Exhibit North Carolina Trial Court Order, #10 Exhibit Colorado Trial Court Order, #11 Exhibit Florida Trial Court Order)(Robinson, Jason)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Striking re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Tammy Tarver, Harry Tarver, #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tammy Tarver, Harry Tarver. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/9/2016. (mb)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opening Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brockman v. AHMC Trial Court Order, #2 Exhibit 2013 Annual Report Excerpts)(Barrett, Lydia)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Annual Report 2015 Excerpts, #2 Exhibit List of Oklahoma Ford Dealerships, #3 Exhibit Fred Jones Bio, #4 Exhibit Ford's Filing History w/OK Sec. of St., #5 Exhibit OSCN Search Results - Ford as Plaintiff - OK Co., #6 Exhibit OSCN Search Results - Ford as Plaintiff - Tulsa Co., #7 Exhibit South Carolina Trial Court Order, #8 Exhibit St. ex rel. Ford v. McGraw, #9 Exhibit North Caroline Trial Court Order, #10 Exhibit Colorado Trial Court Order, #11 Exhibit Florida Trial Court Order, #12 Exhibit Proposed Jurisdictional Discovery Requests)(Barrett, Lydia)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Haylie D Treas on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc (Treas, Haylie)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ford Motor Company . (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc . (Jennings, James)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opening Brief in Support by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ellis Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition)(Jennings, James)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Elizabeth Dwyer, #2 Exhibit 2-Order in Oversen v Kelle's Transport Service, et al.)(Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason E Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robinson, Jason)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard L Denney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denney, Richard)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lydia J Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barrett, Lydia)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc of Consent to Removal (Jennings, James)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James A Jennings, III on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc (Jennings, James)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Smith, Michael)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2016-279 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pleadings Served on Defendant Ford, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2290567. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarver et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Harold C Zuckerman
Represented By: Jason A McVicker
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Andrew L Richardson
Represented By: Daniel N Aizenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Represented By: Haylie D Treas
Represented By: Emily J Bogenschutz
Represented By: James A Jennings, III
Represented By: Matthew E Coveler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Tarver
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tarver
Represented By: Jason E Robinson
Represented By: Lydia J Barrett
Represented By: Richard L Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?