Sastin 2 LLC v. Hemingway Association Inc
Plaintiff: Sastin 2 LLC
Defendant: Hemingway Association Inc
Case Number: 5:2017cv01252
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Plaintiff has not made an adequate showing that the Court has jurisdiction over this matter. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice to their refiling. Plaintiff's 16 Second Motion to Compel Discovery is rendered moot by this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/19/2018. (ml)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Joint Motion to Stay Scheduling Order. Deadlines are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/6/2018. (mb)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit a brief on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction no later than 7/10/2018. Defendant shall respond no later than 7/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/28/2018. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sastin 2 LLC v. Hemingway Association Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sastin 2 LLC
Represented By: John P Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemingway Association Inc
Represented By: Craig W Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?