MDL 2792 SAMSUNG TOP-LOAD WASHING MACHINE MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Plaintiff: Jerry Wells, Carolyn Mccabe, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Anika Bradley, Colin Welsh, Clayton Mulford, Melissa Thaxton, Joy Cooper, Michelle Soto Fielder, Jo Ann Ober, Sylvia DeLuca, Suzann Moore, Thomas DeLuca, Candice Kellas, Katherine Mikrut, Rhoda Tortorici, Mitchell Orenstein, Chad Anderson, Vicky Higginbotham, Todd Wathen, William Losey, Peter Fraker, Kenneth Menzer, Andres Linsey-Bell, Daniel Robinson, Linda L. Raabe, Cathleen Hansen, Malori Soria, Susan Sewell, Micki Wells, Steven Post, Jason Ward, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Colleen Kennedy, Michelle Madrid, David Foster, Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Diane Lane, Carolina M. Zamora, Melissa Hinkhouse, Tracy Pronstroller, Randa Jacobs and Theresa Dzurenda
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Company LTD, Best Buy Co Inc, Sears Holding Corporation, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Lowe's Companies Inc and Home Depot Inc The
In Re: Samsung Top-Load Washing Machine Marketing, Sales Practices And Products Liability Litigation
Interested Party: Nagel Rice, LLP
Case Number: 5:2017ml02792
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Other Hearing set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. (ml)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER resetting Fairness Hearing to 8/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. The Court amends paragraph 26 of Doc. No. #138 granting preliminary approval directing the Settlement Administrator to provide a final report to the Parties no later than 10 days prior to the Fairness Hearing.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/11/19. (ml)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Settlement as more fully set out in Order. The Court will hold a Fairness Hearing on 8/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m., Central Time. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/8/19. (ml)
December 11, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE (other) by Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Joy Cooper, Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Suzann Moore, Clayton Mulford, Steven Post, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Jason Ward, Todd Wathen, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Jerry Wells(on behalf of all others similarly situated (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Micki Wells, Colin Welsh, Carolina M. Zamora re #92 Settlement Agreement, (of Supplement to Settlement Agreement) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Addendum Settlement Agreement)(Federman, William)
December 5, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE (other) by Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Joy Cooper, Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Peter Fraker, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Suzann Moore, Clayton Mulford, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Jason Ward, Todd Wathen, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Jerry Wells(on behalf of all others similarly situated (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Micki Wells, Colin Welsh, Carolina M. Zamora (Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Sears Holdings Corporation) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Individual Case Listing, #2 Exhibit 1 - Revised Settlement Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Revised FAQ Sheet)(Federman, William)
November 30, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11-29-18 before Judge DeGiusti. Court Reporter: Christina L. Clark, Telephone number 405-609-5123. Transcript of: Preliminary Approval of Settlement Volume: I of I Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2019. (cc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti: Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2018 re #108 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Melissa Hinkhouse, Carolina M. Zamora, William Losey, Margo Alexander, Chad Anderson, Jo Ann Ober, Theresa Dzurenda, Susan Sewell, Anika Bradley, Randa Jacobs, David Sanda, Katherine Mikrut, Joy Cooper, Colin Welsh, Candice Kellas, Michelle Soto Fielder, Diane Lane, Todd Wathen, Larry Allen, Melissa Thaxton, Suzann Moore, Jerry Wells, Jason Ward, Sylvia DeLuca, Micki Wells, Rose Wagner, Carolyn Mccabe, Clayton Mulford, Cathleen Hansen, Thomas DeLuca, Peter Fraker, Malori Soria, Andres Linsey-Bell, Rhoda Tortorici, Tracy Pronstroller, Kenneth Menzer, Linda L. Raabe, Vicky Higginbotham, Steven Post, Joseph Troyan, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, Michelle Madrid. (Court Reporter Christy Clark.) (ml)
November 28, 2018 Filing 133 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd (Coats, Sanford)
November 21, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Sears Holding Corporation (Shin, Susan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 131 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H Solomon on behalf of David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein (Solomon, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: (Order more fully set out) Plaintiffs in the above captioned cases filed Responses in Opposition to Samsung's Motion for Reconsideration of Judge Martini's May 21, 2018, Order on October 22, 2018. As these motions were filed after the Court's Order of October 19, 2018, they are stricken. The above captioned cases are hereby stayed pending resolution of the MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval, and counsel for Plaintiffs Kennedy and Orenstein are directed to familiarize themselves with MDL Order in which the Court established a leadership structure for all cases in the MDL, as well as all Case Management Orders filed in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/24/2018. (ml)
October 24, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE (other) by Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Joy Cooper, Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, David Foster, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Suzann Moore, Clayton Mulford, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Jason Ward, Todd Wathen, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Jerry Wells(on behalf of all others similarly situated (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Micki Wells, Colin Welsh, Carolina M. Zamora Regarding Upcoming Change to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Federman, William)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: (Order more fully set out) The Court finds that to fully examine the fairness of the proposed MDL settlement to putative class members, it must consider any possible overlapping settlement proposed in the New Jersey cases recently transferred to the MDL. The Court will hear any argument the parties wish to make regarding the proposed New Jersey settlement at the November 29, 2018, hearing. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/19/2018. (ml)
October 18, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION to Enforce May 21, 2018 Order Enforcing Settlement Agreement Entered by Hon. Wm. J. Martini, MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Reached Prior to Purported Class Action Settlement in MDL by David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Enforce May 21, 2018 Order Enforcing Settlement Agreement Entered by Hon. Wm. J. Martini and for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Reached Prior to Purported Class Action Settlement in MDL, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Attachment Proposed Order, #5 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Nagel, Bruce)
October 16, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. (ml)
October 4, 2018 Filing 125 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict litigation that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Western District of Oklahoma are transferred to the Western District of Oklahoma and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings.Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 10/03/18.(ml)
September 19, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #108 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) and Memorandum of Law in Support Notice of Defendants Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Position on Intervenors' Opposition filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Salamon, Elie)
September 19, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #108 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Federman, William)
September 4, 2018 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #108 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Transcript of May 2, 2018 Hearing, #2 Exhibit 2- Opinion of Judge Martini May 21, 2018)(Nagel, Bruce)
August 23, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa S Weiner (Weiner, Melissa)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #119 Intervenors Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #108 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Responses due by 9/4/2018. Replies due by 9/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/21/2018. (ml)
August 21, 2018 Filing 119 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Matloff, Randee)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint in Wells-Higginbotham v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al, Case No. 17-CIV-46-D [Doc. No. 27] and [Doc. No. 28] are deemed moot. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/17/2018. (ml)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Intervenors are granted 21 days to submit any opposition to the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/2/2018. (mb)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #103 Motion to Intervene and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/2/2018. (mb)
July 27, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION for Order via letter request for additional time to respond to preliminary approval motion by David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein. (Nagel, Bruce)
July 24, 2018 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 FIRST MOTION to Intervene and Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on CTO-2 filed by David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein. (Nagel, Bruce)
July 24, 2018 Filing 113 JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Notice by Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Salamon, Elie)
July 24, 2018 Filing 112 STATUS CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/24/2018. (ml)
July 18, 2018 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 FIRST MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters re: NJ Settlement, #2 Exhibit B - NJ Intervention Briefing, #3 Exhibit C - Briefing on NJ Prelim Approval, #4 Exhibit D - NJ Stay Order, #5 Exhibit E - NJ Motion to Lift Stay, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Vacate CTO, #7 Exhibit G - Settlement Comparison)(Federman, William)
July 18, 2018 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 FIRST MOTION to Intervene Defendants' Notice of Non-opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Salamon, Elie)
July 17, 2018 Filing 109 JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Notice of Expedited Consideration Sought Before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Response to Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2), #2 Exhibit MDL Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2), #3 Exhibit Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2), #4 Exhibit MDL Plaintiffs' Notice of Joinder in Defendant's Motion for Expedited Consideration)(Salamon, Elie)
July 9, 2018 Filing 108 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) and Memorandum of Law in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Peak Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 - FAQ, #5 Exhibit 4 - Claim Form, #6 Exhibit 5 - Claim Form, #7 Exhibit 6 - Claim Form, #8 Exhibit 7 - Claim Form, #9 Exhibit 8 - Opt Out Form, #10 Exhibit 9 - Settlement Comparison)(Federman, William)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Joint Notice Regarding Progress of Fully Executed Global MDL Settlement requesting a further continuance of theresponsive pleading deadline. The sixty day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. The parties will submit an update on the status of the settlement and forthcoming motion for preliminary approval by 7/11/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/9/2018. (ml)
July 6, 2018 Filing 106 JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Notice Regarding Progress of Fully Executed Global MDL Settlement by Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Salamon, Elie)
July 5, 2018 Filing 105 ENTRY of Appearance by Randee M Matloff on behalf of David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein (Matloff, Randee) Modified on 7/5/2018 to correct party association (ml).
July 3, 2018 Filing 104 ENTRY of Appearance by Bruce H Nagel on behalf of David Foster, Colleen Kennedy, Mitchell Orenstein (Nagel, Bruce)
July 3, 2018 Filing 103 FIRST MOTION to Intervene by Colleen Kennedy, David Foster, Mitchell Orenstein. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Nagel, Bruce)
July 2, 2018 Filing 102 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda B Murphy on behalf of Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Clayton Mulford, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Jason Ward, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Micki Wells, Carolina M. Zamora (Murphy, Amanda)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting continuance. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. Parties will submit an update on the status of the settlement and forthcoming motion for preliminary approval by 7/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/2/2018. (ml)
June 29, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd (Joint Notice Regarding Progress of Fully Executed Global MDL Settlement) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shin, Susan)
June 22, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc (NOTICE OF PROTECTIVE APPEALS FILED IN KENNEDY AND ORENSTEIN ACTIONS) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shin, Susan)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting continuance of the responsive pleading deadline. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. Parties will submit an update on the status of the settlement and forthcoming motion for preliminary approval by 6/29/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/21/2018. (ml)
June 18, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd re #96 Notice (other) [AMENDED] JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PROGRESS OF FULLY EXECUTED GLOBAL MDL SETTLEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Arthur)
June 15, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PROGRESS OF FULLY EXECUTED GLOBAL MDL SETTLEMENT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Arthur)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER directing counsel to immediately notify the JPML regarding Kennedy/Orenstein so that it may consider adding the Kennedy/Orenstein class actions as tag-along actions to the MDL; directing the Clerk of Court to send a courtesy copy of this Order to the JPML. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/14/2018. (ml)
June 6, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd re #92 Settlement Agreement, (SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT NOTICE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Arthur)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Joint Notice Regarding Fully Executed Global MDL Settlement requesting a further continuance of the responsive pleading deadline. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. The parties will submit an update on the status of the settlement and forthcoming motion for preliminary approval by 6/15/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/4/2018. (ml)
June 1, 2018 Filing 92 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING FULLY EXECUTED GLOBAL MDL SETTLEMENT) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Brown, Arthur)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. The parties will submit an update on the status of the contemplated settlement by 06/01/ 2018.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/30/2018. (ml)
May 22, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/22/18 before Judge DeGiusti. Court Reporter: Tracy Washbourne, Telephone number 405-314-5431. Transcript of: Status Conference Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (tw, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti: Status Conference held on 5/22/2018. (Court Reporter Tracy Washbourne.) (mb)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The parties have filed a #87 Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Settlement Progress. The request is GRANTED. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. Parties will submit an update on the status of the contemplated settlement by 5/25/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/21/2018. (ml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd - JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT PROGRESS - (Brown, Arthur)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: This matter is set for status conference on 5/22/18 at 10:00 a.m. Appropriate counsel from the established leadership structure are required to attend. Other counsel of record may appear, but this is not required. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/16/2018. (ml)
May 11, 2018 Status Conference set for 5/22/2018 10:00 AM before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. (ml)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Unopposed Motion for Expedited Status Conference. This matter is set for status conference on 5/22/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/11/2018. (ml)
May 8, 2018 Filing 84 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Hearing Expedited by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Nagle Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Nagle Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Hearing Transcript, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 4-17-18 Letter)(Federman, William)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER striking Doc. No. #81 Entry of Appearance filed by Nagel Rice, LLP and Doc. No. #82 Entry of Appearance filed by Nagel Rice, LLP. The Notices of Appearance filed by Nagel Rice, LLP., do not comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or this Courts Local Rules and are hereby stricken. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/8/2018. (ml)
May 7, 2018 Filing 82 STRICKEN. ENTRY of Appearance by Randee M Matloff on behalf of Nagel Rice, LLP (Matloff, Randee) Modified on 5/8/2018. See Doc. No. #83 (ml).
May 7, 2018 Filing 81 STRICKEN. ENTRY of Appearance by Randee M Matloff on behalf of Nagel Rice, LLP (Matloff, Randee) Modified on 5/8/2018. See Doc. No. #83 (ml).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Settlement Progress. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline remains stayed. Parties will submit an update on the status of the contemplated settlement by 5/18/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/3/2018. (ml)
April 30, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE (other) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd (Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Settlement Progress) (Brown, Arthur)
April 26, 2018 Filing 78 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/26/18. (ml)
April 24, 2018 Filing 77 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order (JOINT MOTION FOR AGREED SUPPLEMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplement to Protective Order)(Brown, Arthur)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting the #75 Joint Notice Regarding Settlement Progress. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline is stayed. Parties to submit an update on the status of the proposed settlement by 4/30/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/2/2018. (ml)
March 30, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs JOINT NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROGRESS (Lichtman, Jason)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Joint Motion to Suspend Deadlines Pending Upcoming Mediation. The 60 day responsive pleading deadline is temporarily stayed. Parties will submit an update on the status of their case resolution efforts by 3/30/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/22/2018. (ml)
March 16, 2018 Filing 73 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time - Joint Motion to Suspend Deadlines Pending Upcoming Mediation by Samsung Top-Load Washing Machine Marketing, Sales Practices And Products Liability Litigation. (Lichtman, Jason)
March 12, 2018 Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Order More Fully Setout. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/12/2018. (mb)
February 23, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Order (Defendants Motion for Entry of Defendants Proposed Case Management) by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants Proposed Case Management Order)(Brown, Arthur)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Parties are granted an extension until 12:00 p.m., 2/23/2018 to submit proposed case management order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/23/2018. (mb)
February 21, 2018 Filing 69 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Shin, Susan)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Proposed case management order due 2/21/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/2/18. (ml)
February 1, 2018 Filing 67 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Shin, Susan)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER directing Clerk to administratively close CIV-17-1079-D. Within 30 days of the final disposition of the Wells/Higginbotham litigation, or upon other good cause, the parties may move to reopen this action, otherwise it will be deemed to be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/22/18. (ml)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER on Contested Issues. Within 21 days the parties are to meet and confer and submit an agreed Proposed Case Management Order for consideration by the Court. In the event the parties cannot agree on a Proposed Case Management Order they may submit separate orders within the same time period. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/12/2018. (mb)
January 10, 2018 Filing 64 ENTRY of Appearance by Avery Halfon on behalf of Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Suzann Moore, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Todd Wathen, Colin Welsh (Halfon, Avery)
January 9, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re #62 Order on Motion to Supplement, Notice of Filing Supplement to Exhibit 4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement to Exhibit 4)(Lichtman, Jason)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Supplement the Record. Plaintiffs are granted leave to supplement Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Stay of Discovery and in Support of a Bellwether Procedures. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/8/18. (ml)
January 4, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Supplement prior exhibit by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit 4)(Lichtman, Jason)
December 28, 2017 Filing 60 REPLY by Plaintiffs Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Joy Cooper, Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Suzann Moore, Clayton Mulford, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Jason Ward, Todd Wathen, Jerry Wells, Jerry Wells, Micki Wells, Colin Welsh, Carolina M. Zamora re #54 Response, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' JPML Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Consumer Laws, #3 Exhibit 3 - Implied Warranty, #4 Exhibit 4 - Express Warranty)(Lichtman, Jason)
December 27, 2017 Filing 59 STIPULATION of the Parties to Protocol for Production of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by All Plaintiffs. (Federman, William)
December 22, 2017 Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/22/2017. (mb)
December 14, 2017 Filing 56 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order and Submission of ESI Protocol by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - ESI Protocol)(Federman, William)
December 14, 2017 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT (DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.' S NOTICE PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S NOVEMBER 21, 2017 ORDER) by Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Brown, Arthur)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are hereby granted a seven-day extension from December 7, 2017. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/7/17. (ml)
December 7, 2017 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #23 Status Report,,,,, DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS BRIEF REGARDING CURRENT STATUS OF CONSOLIDATED CASES filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Brown, Arthur) Modified on 12/8/2017 to correct filers (ml).
December 6, 2017 Filing 53 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Shin, Susan)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER establishing the organizational structure as more fully set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/6/17. (ml)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave for Craig E. Hilborn to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Melissa Hinkhouse. Mr. Hilborn's name and email address shall be removed from this case's official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/29/17. (ml)
November 28, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Melissa Hinkhouse by Melissa Hinkhouse. (Federman, William)
November 28, 2017 Filing 49 ENTRY of Appearance by David M Kramer on behalf of Melissa Hinkhouse (Kramer, David)
November 22, 2017 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #30 Other Hearing (LETTER from Arthur E. Brown to Hon. Timothy D. DeGiusti) filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Brown, Arthur)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER striking #37 Stipulation and Consent for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/22/17. (ml)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #35 Defendants' Application for Withdrawal of Stewart D. Aaron. Stewart D. Aaron's name and email address shall be removed from this case's official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/22/17. (ml)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/17. (ml)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #34 Defendants' Application for Withdrawal of Jeffrey M. Wagner. Jeffrey M. Wagner's name and email address shall be removed from this case's official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/17. (ml)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #33 Defendants' Application for Withdrawal of Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. Ingo W. Sprie, Jr.'s name and email address shall be removed from this case's official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/17. (ml)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #32 Defendants Application for Withdrawal of Maggie C. Maurone. Maggie C. Maurone's name and email address shall be removed from this cases official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/17. (ml)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #31 Defendants Application for Withdrawal of Kenneth L. Chernof. Kenneth L. Chernof's name and email address shall be removed from this cases official docket. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/21/17. (ml)
November 20, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11-16-17 before Judge DeGiusti. Court Reporter: Christina L. Clark, Telephone number 405-609-5123. Transcript of: Proceedings Volume: I of I Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (cc)
November 20, 2017 Filing 37 Stricken: STIPULATION and Consent for Substitution of Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Hilborn, Craig) See #47 Order on 11/22/2017 (ml).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER striking #38 Stipulation filed by Melissa Hinkhouse. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/17/17. (ml)
November 17, 2017 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (LETTER re review and compliance of #12 Plaintiffs' Motion) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Federman, William)
November 17, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave for Withdrawal of Stewart D. Aaron by All Defendants. (Abowitz, Murray)
November 17, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave for Withdrawal of Jeffrey M. Wagner by All Defendants. (Abowitz, Murray)
November 17, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave for Withdrawal of Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. by All Defendants. (Abowitz, Murray)
November 17, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave for Withdrawal of Maggie C. Maurone by All Defendants. (Abowitz, Murray)
November 17, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave for Withdrawal of Kenneth L. Chernof by All Defendants. (Abowitz, Murray)
November 16, 2017 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2017. (Court Reporter Christy Clark.) (mb)
November 15, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION for Leave To File Motion To Limit The Agenda For The Initial Case Management Conference In Accordance With The Courts Order Dated October 13, 2017 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Federman, William)
November 15, 2017 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn E Griffin on behalf of Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Suzann Moore, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Todd Wathen, Colin Welsh (Griffin, Kathryn)
November 14, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave To File Motion To Limit The Agenda For The Initial Case Management Conference In Accordance With The Courts Order Dated October 13, 2017 by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation, Home Depot Inc The. (Brown, Arthur)
November 14, 2017 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by John P Zelbst on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zelbst, John)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave for Denise L. Morris to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Cathleen Hansen. Shpetim Ademi, John D. Blythin, and Mark A Eldridge of Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP shall continue to serve as counsel for Plaintiff Cathleen Hansen in this action. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/13/17. (ml)
November 9, 2017 Filing 38 STRICKEN: STIPULATION and Consent for Substitution of Counsel by Melissa Hinkhouse. (Hilborn, Craig) (ml)
November 9, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Joint Proposed Agenda for November 16, 2017 Initial Case Management Conference) (Brown, Arthur)
November 9, 2017 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Current Status of Consolidated Cases by Plaintiffs Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Joy Cooper, Sylvia DeLuca, Thomas DeLuca, Theresa Dzurenda, Michelle Soto Fielder, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Andres Linsey-Bell, William Losey, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Suzann Moore, Clayton Mulford, Jo Ann Ober, Steven Post, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, Daniel Robinson, Harvey Ross, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Melissa Thaxton, Rhoda Tortorici, Joseph Troyan, Rose Wagner, Jason Ward, Todd Wathen, Jerry Wells, Jerry Wells, Micki Wells, Colin Welsh, Carolina M. Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Moore Dkt. Nos. 14, 15, 16, #2 Exhibit 2 - Moore Dkt. No. 22, #3 Exhibit 3 - Moore Dkt. No. 94-3 (Spragens Decl.), #4 Exhibit 4 - Moore 12(b)(6) Briefing, #5 Exhibit 5 - Moore Order Denying Stay, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order and Memorandum of Judge O'Neill, #7 Exhibit 7 - Wagner Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' Proposed CMO, #9 Exhibit 9 - Moore Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10 - Moore Docket No. 108-2, #11 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Protocol, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of William B. Federman)(Federman, William)
November 9, 2017 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (Defendants' Brief Regarding Current Status of Consolidated Cases) by Defendants Best Buy Co Inc, Home Depot Inc The, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Brown, Arthur)
November 3, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Cathleen Hansen by Cathleen Hansen. (Federman, William)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER striking #19 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Cathleen Hansen; striking #14 Notices of Withdrawal of Counsel; striking #15 Notices of Withdrawal of Counsel; striking #16 Notices of Withdrawal of Counsel; striking #17 Notices of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/3/17. (ml)
November 1, 2017 Filing 19 Stricken. See Doc. No. #20 Order. MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Cathleen Hansen by Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Clayton Mulford, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Jason Ward, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Jerry Wells(on behalf of all others similarly situated (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Carolina M. Zamora. (Federman, William) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ml).
October 29, 2017 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Wells on behalf of Margo Alexander, Larry Allen, Chad Anderson, Anika Bradley, Peter Fraker, Cathleen Hansen, Vicky Higginbotham, Melissa Hinkhouse, Randa Jacobs, Candice Kellas, Diane Lane, Michelle Madrid, Carolyn Mccabe, Kenneth Menzer, Katherine Mikrut, Clayton Mulford, Tracy Pronstroller, Linda L. Raabe, David Sanda, Susan Sewell, Malori Soria, Jason Ward, Jerry Wells(on behalf of himself (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Jerry Wells(on behalf of all others similarly situated (OKWD 17-CIV-46-D)), Micki Wells, Carolina M. Zamora (Wells, Joshua)
October 25, 2017 Filing 17 Stricken. See Doc. No. #20 Order. NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Maggie Maurone) (Brown, Arthur) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ml).
October 25, 2017 Filing 16 Stricken. See Doc. No. #20 Order. NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Kenneth Chernof) (Brown, Arthur) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ml).
October 25, 2017 Filing 15 Stricken. See Doc. No. #20 Order. NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Ingo Sprie) (Brown, Arthur) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ml).
October 25, 2017 Filing 14 Stricken. See Doc. No. #20 Order. NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Jeffrey Wagner) (Brown, Arthur) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ml).
October 20, 2017 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie E Niehaus on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd (Niehaus, Stephanie)
October 19, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Federman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Lichtman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 Carson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 Goldstein Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 Green Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 Kupperman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 Levin Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 McVey Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 Weiner Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 Zelbst Declaration)(Federman, William)
October 19, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE (other) by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation re #10 Order, (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Aaron, Stewart)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Stewart D. Aaron is hereby relieved of his role as Defendants' Interim Liaison Counsel and Arthur E. Brown is hereby appointed Defendants' Interim Liaison Counsel in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/18/17. (ml)
October 16, 2017 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #6 Order, Set Hearings,, (LETTER from Stewart D. Aaron to Hon. Timothy D. DeGiusti) filed by Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation. (Brown, Arthur)
October 16, 2017 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur E Brown on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Brown, Arthur)
October 13, 2017 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring 5:17-cv-1110 transferred from District of Maine 2:17-cv-00242; transferring 5:17-cv-1111 transferred from District of Illinois Northern 1:17-cv-04816 to become part of MDL 2792.(ml)
October 13, 2017 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan E Green on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Lowe's Companies Inc, Lowes Home Center LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Sears Holding Corporation (Green, Jonathan)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LIAISON. COUNSEL.Initial Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 1:30 PM before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Lead Counsel is William B Federman for Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel and Stewart D Aaron for Defendants' Liaison Counsel. Briefs due 7 days prior to CMC. Contact List due by 11/16/17 at the CMC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/13/17. (ml)
October 13, 2017 Filing 5 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407 that the actions pending in districts other than the Western District of Oklahoma are transferred to the District of Oklahoma, creating MDL 2792. Case assigned to Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Signed by Clerk of the Panel on 10/13/17. (ml) Modified on 10/13/2017 to upload new document lifting stay (ml).
October 12, 2017 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring 5:17-cv-1079 transferred from District of Kentucky Western 3:17-cv-00272; transferring 5:17-CV-1080 transferred from District of Florida Southern 0:17-cv-61022; transferring 5:17-CV-1081 transferred from District of Louisiana Western 2:17-cv-00195; transferring 5:17-CV-1084 transferred from District of New York Eastern 2:17-cv-02353; transferring 5:17-CV-1085 transferred from District of Nebraska 4:17-cv-03017; transferring 5:17-CV-1086 transferred from District of California Eastern 2:17-cv-00946; transferring 5:17-cv-01087 transferred from District of New Jersey 2:16-cv-04966; transferring 5:17-cv-01088 transferred from District of South Carolina 6:17-cv-00988; transferring 5:17-cv-01091 transferred from District of Michigan Western 2:17-cv-00039; transferring 5:17-cv-01092 transferred from District of Georgia Northern 1:17-cv-01232; transferring 5:17-cv-01094 transferred from District of Minnesota 0:17-cv-01569; transferring 5:17-cv-01095 transferred from District of California Central 5:17-cv-00203; transferring 5:17-cv-01096 transferred from District of Pennsylvania Western 2:16-cv-01873; transferring 5:17-cv-01098 transferred from District of California Central 2:17-cv-03602; transferring 5:17-cv-01099 transferred from District of Pennsylvania Eastern 2:16-cv-03623; transferring 5:17-cv-01100 transferred from District of New York Southern 1:17-cv-01525; transferring 5:17-cv-01101 transferred from District of Texas Western 5:17-cv-00163; transferring 5:17-cv-01104 transferred from District of North Carolina Middle 1:17-cv-00171; transferring 5:17-cv-01056 transferred from District of Delaware 1:17-cv-00371; transferring 5:17-cv-01105 transferred from District of Texas Southern 7:17-cv-00154; to become part of MDL 2792. (ml)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Vacate the September 8, 2017 Pretrial Scheduling Order entered in Suzann Moore, et al. v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al. The September 8, 2017 Pretrial Scheduling Order is vacated in all respects. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/10/17. (ml)
October 9, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re: Leadership Structure (Federman, William)
October 6, 2017 Filing 2 FIRST MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Order by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abowitz, Murray)
October 6, 2017 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 17-ML-2792-D has been opened and assigned to Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. See Docket for further entries. As the case proceeds, counsel may be alerted to updated case listings, or Case Management Orders in a similar fashion. However, once Liaison Counsel are appointed and shoulder the responsibility of service for documents posted in the lead case, such docket entries will no longer be necessary. (ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDL 2792 SAMSUNG TOP-LOAD WASHING MACHINE MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Paul Myung Han Kim
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Bruce A Khula
Represented By: Philip M Oliss
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Sean P Neafsey
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Kristin L Bryan
Represented By: Stephanie E Niehaus
Represented By: Mahnu V Davar
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Janukowicz
Represented By: Alvin Bruce Davis
Represented By: Arthur H Stroyd, Jr
Represented By: Michael R McDonald
Represented By: Joseph P LaSala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Company LTD
Represented By: Philip M Oliss
Represented By: Arthur H Stroyd, Jr
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co Inc
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holding Corporation
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Center LLC
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Bruce A Khula
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Elie Salamon
Represented By: Sean P Neafsey
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Kristin L Bryan
Represented By: Stephanie E Niehaus
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Arthur E Brown
Represented By: Jonathan E Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Inc The
Represented By: Susan L Shin
Represented By: Paul Richard Johnson
Represented By: S Stewart Haskins
Represented By: Kim A Tran
Represented By: J Andrew Pratt
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Murray E Abowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Samsung Top-Load Washing Machine Marketing, Sales Practices And Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wells
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mccabe
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Stephen C Smith
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Troyan
Represented By: Charles E Schaffer
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Daniel A Rihn
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Wagner
Represented By: Shannon C Carr
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Melissa S Weiner
Represented By: Edward A Wallace
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Tyler J Story
Represented By: Michael T Fantini
Represented By: Amy E Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Bradley
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Guy W Crabtree
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Welsh
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Mulford
Represented By: David W Rowe
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Thaxton
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Cooper
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Jayne A Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Soto Fielder
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Ober
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia DeLuca
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzann Moore
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas DeLuca
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Kellas
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: David Andrew Bain
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Mikrut
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda Tortorici
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Orenstein
Represented By: Robert H Solomon
Represented By: Randee M Matloff
Represented By: Bruce H Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Anderson
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Gregg M Corwin
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Represented By: Joshua Hegarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Higginbotham
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Wathen
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Losey
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fraker
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Menzer
Represented By: Gary Steven Menzer
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Linsey-Bell
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Robinson
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Raabe
Represented By: James R Noblin
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Robert S Green
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Hansen
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Denise L Morris
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malori Soria
Represented By: Stephen H Kupperman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sewell
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Alan L. Kovacs
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micki Wells
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Theile B McVey
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Post
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ward
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Stephen C Smith
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Ross
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sanda
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: John Daniel Kassel
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Theile B McVey
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Kennedy
Represented By: Robert H Solomon
Represented By: Randee M Matloff
Represented By: Bruce H Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Madrid
Represented By: James R Noblin
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Robert S Green
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Foster
Represented By: Robert H Solomon
Represented By: Randee M Matloff
Represented By: Bruce H Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Alexander
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: James T. Crotty
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Allen
Represented By: James R Noblin
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Robert S Green
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Lane
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina M. Zamora
Represented By: Francisco J Enriquez
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hinkhouse
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: David M Kramer
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Pronstroller
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randa Jacobs
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Represented By: Robert W. Bishop
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: John S. Friend
Represented By: Amanda B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Dzurenda
Represented By: Avery Halfon
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Kathryn E Griffin
Represented By: Andrew Bryan Miller
Represented By: Anthony W Patterson
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Scott L Starr
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Laura B Heiman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nagel Rice, LLP
Represented By: Randee M Matloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?