Helms et al v. Producers Service Corporation
Plaintiff: Samuel Helms
Defendant: Producers Service Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv00684
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 @ 09:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 10/08/2018. (lam)
August 24, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Producers Service Corporation.(Feheley, Brendan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca R Price on behalf of Producers Service Corporation (Price, Rebecca)
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Brendan P Feheley on behalf of Producers Service Corporation (Feheley, Brendan)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Brendan Patrick Feheley, Esq., and Rebecca Roderer Price, Esq.'s #16 and #17 motions for admission pro hac vice, conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within 7 days from entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 8/16/2018. (cla)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Price Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2755399 by Producers Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bruce, Philip)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brenden Feheley Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2755388 by Producers Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bruce, Philip)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting defendant's #14 unopposed motion for extension of deadline; defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 08/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 8/9/2018. (cla)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Producers Service Corporation. (Bruce, Philip)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip R Bruce on behalf of Producers Service Corporation (Bruce, Philip)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of Producers Service Corporation (Ross, Paul)
August 3, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Helms(Individually), Samuel Helms(On behalf of all others similarly situated). Producers Service Corporation served on 7/20/2018. (Braddy, Lauren)
August 3, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren E Braddy on behalf of Samuel Helms(Individually), Samuel Helms(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Braddy, Lauren)
August 3, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by William C Alexander on behalf of Samuel Helms(Individually), Samuel Helms(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Alexander, William)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the motions for admission pro hac vice #6 and #7 of William Clifton Alexander, Esq., and Lauren Elizabeth Braddy, Esq., conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within 7 days from entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 7/27/2018. (cla)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Elizabeth Braddy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2744430 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Elizabeth Braddy)(McIntyre, Noble)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2744420 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander)(McIntyre, Noble)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Consents to Join for Michael M. Contreras & Rodney Scott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent to Join Wage Claim Michael M Contreras, #2 Exhibit 2-Consent to Join Wage Claim Rodney Scott)(McIntyre, Noble)
July 20, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2741028. (Alexander, William)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Consent to Join for Clay Wells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join for Clay Wells)(McIntyre, Noble)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Producers Service Corporation. (rmc)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Producers Service Corporation filed by Samuel Helms(Individually), Samuel Helms(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Helms Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helms et al v. Producers Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Producers Service Corporation
Represented By: Philip R Bruce
Represented By: Brendan P Feheley
Represented By: Paul A Ross
Represented By: Rebecca R Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Helms
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Represented By: Lauren E Braddy
Represented By: William C Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?