Murdock v. Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co. Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David H Murdock
Defendant: Robert Bruce Michael, John Ruffu, Gwendolyn Michael, Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co. Inc. and Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00698
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/12/18. (jw)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Dismissal)(King, Bryan)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theona Zhordania. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/14/18. (jw)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2751776 by David H Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(French, Robert)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from David H Murdock in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500068974 regarding #1 Complaint. (nv)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Defendants shall file their answer to Plaintiff's Complaint not later than August 24, 2018. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/7/18. (jw)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (King, Bryan)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan N B King on behalf of All Defendants (King, Bryan)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co Inc, Gwendolyn Michael, Robert Bruce Michael, and John Ruffu. (nv)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co Inc, Gwendolyn Michael, Robert Bruce Michael, and John Ruffu filed by David H Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdock v. Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bruce Michael
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ruffu
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Michael
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Rock Island & Pacific Railroad Co Inc
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H Murdock
Represented By: James M Peters
Represented By: Robert A French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?