Richardson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Keith Richardson
Defendant: K Orange, Bureau of Prisons, Kassidy Burchette, K Deemers, FNU Coates, Kevin Mackey, A Russell, Ryan Doyle, Jason Williams, Rick Salmon, Public Health Service Employee's, Jeff Sessions, Debra Aynes, Kristi Egelston, Jessina Graham, FNU Garza, S Johnson, United States of America, Joseph Eglsaer and FNU Sieja
Case Number: 5:2018cv00763
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #14 Report and Recommendation. United States of America, Debra Aynes, K. Deemers, A. Russell, Kristi Egleston and S. Johnson are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/5/2018. (mb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION Requesting Service of Process on Remaining Defendants by Bryan Keith Richardson. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Bryan Keith Richardson filed by Bryan Keith Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Bryan Keith Richardson. It is recommended that Defendants United States of America, Debra Aynes, K. Deemers, A. Russell, Kristi Egleston, and S. Johnson be dismissed based on the failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The undersigned recommends Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants proceed. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2018. This Report and Recommendation does not dispose of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/24/18. (rmc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER from Bryan Keith Richardson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ml)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bryan Keith Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(ml)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Plaintiff is given the opportunity to file an amended complaint to allege one or more plausible constitutional claims. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before September 17th, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/27/2018. (cps)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTER ORDER DENING AS MOOT #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/27/2018. (cps)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 Receipt for Money Received from Bryan Keith Richardson in the amount of $3.80, receipt number 0KW500069229 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to Bryan Keith Richardson #86357-011 LOMPOC-USP 3901 Klein Blvd Lompoc, CA 93436. Balance: $346.20 (ml)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee by Bryan Keith Richardson. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Having reviewed the motion, the Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee, and his motion is granted. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/13/2018. (cps)
August 10, 2018 Notice of Mailing Doc. #1 , #6 and LCvR5.4/Change of Address form to Bryan Keith Richardson #86357-011 LOMPOC-USP 3901 Klein Blvd Lompoc, CA 93436 (ml)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Entered at the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/10/18. (ml)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 NO PREVIOUS Cases (ml)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bryan Keith Richardson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryan Keith Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Complaint, filed by Bryan Keith Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Debra Aynes, Kassidy Burchette, Bureau of Prisons, FNU Coates, K Deemers, Ryan Doyle, Kristi Egelston, FNU Garza, Jessina Graham, S Johnson, Kevin Mackey, K Orange, Public Health Service Employee's, A Russell, Rick Salmon, Jeff Sessions, United States of America, Jason Williams filed by Bryan Keith Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proof, #2 Exhibit 2- After, #3 Exhibit 3- Suffering, #4 Exhibit 4- Shoes, #5 Attachment 1-Affidavit, #6 Envelope)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassidy Burchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Deemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Health Service Employee's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Aynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Egelston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessina Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Eglsaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Sieja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Keith Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?