Acosta v. Kchao et al
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Kchao and Kchao Hospitality LLC and Rany Kchao
Case Number: 5:2018cv00807
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 11:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (mb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan T Velie on behalf of All Defendants (Velie, Jonathan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Disregard: See Doc. No. #5 . ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan T Velie on behalf of All Defendants (Velie, Jonathan) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ml).
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: agreement, email, filing docs)(Velie, Jonathan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rany Kchao, Kchao and Kchao Hospitality LLC. (ml)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rany Kchao, Kchao and Kchao Hospitality LLC filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Kchao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kchao and Kchao Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Jonathan T Velie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rany Kchao
Represented By: Jonathan T Velie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Gregory W Tronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?