Daniels v. Allegiant Travel Company et al
Plaintiff: Dontae Daniels
Defendant: SAS Transportation LLC and Allegiant Travel Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv00815
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Lee R West
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 11:30 AM in Room 1305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (jb)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian T Maye on behalf of Allegiant Travel Company (Maye, Brian)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Lee R. West no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Lee R. West on 9/7/2018. (kb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allegiant Travel Company.(Stiner, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory W Milstead on behalf of Dontae Daniels (Milstead, Gregory)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dontae Daniels. (Travis, Rex)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Rex K Travis on behalf of Dontae Daniels (Travis, Rex)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Allegiant Travel Company . (Stiner, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of Allegiant Travel Company (Stiner, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-3997 filed by Allegiant Travel Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 -- EOA, #3 Exhibit 3 -- EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Return of Service, #6 Exhibit 6 -- Declaration, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) Modified on 8/30/2018 (ml).
August 22, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2759140. (Stiner, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Allegiant Travel Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAS Transportation LLC
Represented By: John D Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Travel Company
Represented By: John D Stiner
Represented By: Brian T Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontae Daniels
Represented By: Rex K Travis
Represented By: Gregory W Milstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?