Langston v. US Security Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Paul Langston
Defendant: US Security Associates Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00868
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by US Security Associates Inc.(Hollis, Edward)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint US Security Associates Inc answer due 11/2/2018.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/24/2018. (md)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by US Security Associates Inc. (Blassingame, Johnny)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Langston. US Security Associates Inc served on 9/12/2018. (Nilges, Hans)
September 18, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan P Elgin on behalf of US Security Associates Inc (Elgin, Susan)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory P Abrams on behalf of US Security Associates Inc (Abrams, Gregory)
September 18, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward E Hollis on behalf of US Security Associates Inc (Hollis, Edward)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry D Green on behalf of Paul Langston (Green, Kerry)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Edward)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon M Draher on behalf of Paul Langston (Draher, Shannon)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Hans A Nilges on behalf of Paul Langston (Nilges, Hans)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/17/2018. (md)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2774403 by US Security Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Blassingame, Johnny)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2774388 by US Security Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Blassingame, Johnny)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2774357 by US Security Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Blassingame, Johnny)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by US Security Associates Inc . (Blassingame, Johnny)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Johnny R Blassingame, Jr on behalf of US Security Associates Inc (Blassingame, Johnny)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiffs counsel are advised that within seven days from the date of this order, they must file an entry of appearance in accordance with LCvR 83.4, associate with local counsel pursuant to LCvR 83.3 and local counsel must also file an entry of appearance. Entered at the direction of Judge Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/11/2018. (md)
September 7, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2768208. (Nilges, Hans)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to US Security Associates Inc. (ac)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Security Associates Inc filed by Paul Langston. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. US Security Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Security Associates Inc
Represented By: Johnny R Blassingame, Jr
Represented By: Susan P Elgin
Represented By: Edward E Hollis
Represented By: Gregory P Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Langston
Represented By: Shannon M Draher
Represented By: Hans A Nilges
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?