Vanhoose v. Biomet Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Vanhoose
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC and Biomet Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00878
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 166 ENTRY of Appearance by Emalie L Rott on behalf of All Defendants (Rott, Emalie)
October 29, 2018 165 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle M Tessier on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC (Tessier, Michelle)
October 29, 2018 164 ENTRY of Appearance by Tom S Joensen on behalf of All Defendants (Joensen, Tom)
October 29, 2018 163 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie Koltookian on behalf of All Defendants (Koltookian, Stephanie)
October 24, 2018 162 Featured Case ORDER granting #159 , #160 and #161 Tom Joensen, Esq., Michelle M. Tessier, Esq., and Stephanie Anne Koltooklan, Esq., motions for leave to appear pro hac vice as counsel for defendants. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/24/2018. (lam)
October 24, 2018 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephanie Anne Koltookian Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2797562 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Smith, Michael)
October 24, 2018 160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michelle M. Tessier Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2797558 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Smith, Michael)
October 24, 2018 159 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tom Joensen Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2797557 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Smith, Michael)
October 18, 2018 158 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet US Reconstruction LLC . (Smith, Michael)
October 18, 2018 157 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet Orthopedics LLC . (Smith, Michael)
October 18, 2018 156 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Biomet Inc . (Smith, Michael)
October 17, 2018 155 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Smith, Michael)
September 12, 2018 154 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00424.
September 6, 2018 153 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order this case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Oklahoma. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 6, 2018 152 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 24, 2018 151 Featured Case ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 16, 2018 150 Featured Case ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 26, 2018 149 Featured Case ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 18, 2018 148 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 12, 2018 147 Featured Case Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 29, 2018 146 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 17, 2018 145 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 9, 2018 144 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 23, 2018 143 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 10, 2018 142 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 29, 2018 141 Featured Case ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 26, 2018 140 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 14, 2018 139 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 12, 2018 138 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 8, 2018 137 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 1, 2018 136 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 30, 2018 135 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 25, 2018 134 Featured Case Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 21, 2017 133 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 18, 2017 132 Featured Case ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 12, 2017 131 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 26, 2017 130 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 23, 2017 129 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 28, 2017 128 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 18, 2017 127 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 14, 2017 126 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 10, 2017 125 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 15, 2017 124 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 28, 2017 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 28, 2017 123 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR APRIL 24, 2017 PRO SE HEARING AND STATUS CONFERENCE Brenda Fulmer appeared for the plaintiffs; John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Linder Hanig appeared for the defendants. Topics addressed included the pro se and Metal-on-Polyethylene (MoP) cases, active case count, status of discovery in Groups 3 and 4, and pending motions with actions taken in specific case as set forth in the Order. The next status conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 am (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 24, 2017 122 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/24/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dfts appeared by atty John Winter, John LaDue, and Erin Hanig. Roland Jarquio appears on behalf of Nabileh & Ramon Jarquio (3:13cv933). The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 21, 2017 121 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the April 24, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/21/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 28, 2017 120 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Ahmed Diab, Brenda Fulmer, and Justin Presnal. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig, and John LaDue. The parties advised the court on the status of active/unresolved cases and discovery; indicated that they had reached an agreement regarding the composition of Group 4 for discovery purposes and would be submitting a proposed order by early April, with scheduling deadlines to be determined by the court; and confirmed that the hearing regarding management of the remaining pro se cases would proceed as scheduled on April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). The court set the next status conference for April 24, 2017, following the pro se case management hearing. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 23, 2017 119 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the March 28, 2017 telephonic status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 23, 2017 118 Featured Case ORDER On the courts own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference currently set for February 27, 2017 is RESET for Tuesday, March 28, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 15, 2016 117 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR DECEMBER 15, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for 2/27/2017 09:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
November 8, 2016 116 Featured Case ORDER DENYING #114 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena to David Vickers by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. The Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 11/29/2016 for the limited purpose of conducting David Vickers' deposition. Parties ADVISED that no further extension of the discovery deadline will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. The circumstances of the instant Motion do not justify the award of expenses, including attorney fees, for either paty. Therefore, the parties will bear any costs incurred both in pursuing David Vickers' failed deposition in September, 2016 and in litigating the instant Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/8/16. (cer) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 20, 2016 115 AFFIDAVIT re #114 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena to David Vickers by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 20, 2016 114 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena to David Vickers by Defendants Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 7, 2016 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein no longer assigned to case. (slm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 10, 2016 113 Featured Case ORDER granting #110 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Makesha N Nowell PHV for Sharon Vanhoose. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 06/10/2016. (mtr) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 31, 2016 112 Featured Case ORDER: This case was included in error in the court's #111 Dismissal Order. The #111 Order Dismissing Case is VACATED, as to this case only. Case reopened.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/31/16. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 26, 2016 111 Featured Case ***VACATED PER #112 ORDER*** ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal and Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/26/2016. (jld) Modified on 5/31/2016 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 24, 2016 110 Application for Attorney Makesha Nicole Nowell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vanhoose, Sharon. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, ) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 19, 2016 109 Featured Case ORDER By agreement of the parties, the May 23, 2016 telephonic hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/19/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 11, 2016 108 Featured Case ORDER: By agreement of the parties the 5/12/2016 hearing on discovery related issues is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/11/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 26, 2016 106 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF APRIL 25, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed. Defendants to submit proposed order re: dismissal of remaining settled/funded cases. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 25, 2016 107 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward, J. Presnal, B. Fulmer, L. Stevens. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Telephonic hearings set for May 12, 2016 at 9:00 am (EDT) and May 23, 2016 at 1:00 pm (EDT) to address discovery related issues, if needed. Next status conference set for June 6, 2016 at 1:30 pm (EDT). (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 14, 2016 105 Featured Case NOTICE REGARDING FUTURE FILINGS To ensure notice is provided to all parties, the court's orders regarding deadlines and events applicable to every case associated with MDL 2391 will be filed in all member cases as well as in 3:12md2391. Filings made by the parties in 3:12md2391 will be available on the court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system or in the Clerk's Office, but will not be spread to individual cases unless a request is made and approved. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/14/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 13, 2016 Motion Terminated (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 13, 2016 104 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING (3117) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jenya M Moshkovich PHV terminated in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/13/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 12, 2016 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by In Re Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (MDL 2391). Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Moshkovich PHV, Jenya) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 7, 2016 102 Featured Case ORDER Based on counsels representation that the parties have reached an agreement regarding the discovery disputes addressed in the courts March 28 memorandum, the hearing scheduled for April 26, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/7/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 4, 2016 HEARING RESET: By agreement of the parties, the hearing previously set for 4/14/16 is RESET to 4/26/2016 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 4/5/2016 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 31, 2016 101 Featured Case ORDER For all future discovery-related telephonic status conferences the court orders: 1) Parties shall notify the court in writing at least 48 hours in advance of the scheduled conference whether a conference is necessary and if so, the issues to be addressed; and 2) parties shall be responsible for notify its side's attorneys about the conference and arranging the telephonic participation of those attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/31/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 31, 2016 100 MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 31, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Kyle Bachus, Justin Presnal, and Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty John LaDue and John Winter. Following discussion, the court: 1) ordered counsel of record in 3:13cv1008 (Jacqueline Jones v. Biomet) and 3:14cv1482 (Mary E Stewart v. Biomet) to product to Biomet through PSC-II proposed deposition dates by 4/15/16; 2) held that if proposed deposition dates are not produced, Biomet may move for sanctions under F.R.C.P. 37(b); and 3) directed PSC-II to ensure that counsel of record in those cases receives notice of this order. (Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 16, 2016 99 MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 14, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Telephonic hearings set for March 31, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (EDT) and April 14, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (EDT) to resolve any future discovery disputes. Next status conference set for April 25, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/16/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 14, 2016 98 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/14/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer, Jasper Ward, Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Blaine Dart, John LaDue, Erin Linder Hanig, John Winter. Discussions held. Court to rule in writing on the parties' discovery dispute. Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 3/16/2016 (jld). Modified on 3/17/2016 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 8, 2016 97 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call in information for March 14, 2016 status conference at 2:00 PM (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/8/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 7, 2016 3087 Motion for Discovery terminated in case 3:12-md-2391-RLM-CAN. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 7, 2016 3087 Motion for Discovery terminated in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 7, 2016 96 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Steering Committee Memorandum of the Parties' Dispute Regarding Supplementation of Prior Discovery Requests to Biomet by MDL - Notice Only Navan Ward, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Ward PHV, Navan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 3, 2016 95 Featured Case ORDER The court GRANTS the unopposed motion to remove plaintiff Henry Cook from Group I Class [docket # 92 in 3:15cv77] and DENIES as moot his earlier motion [docket # 88] seeking the same relief.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 2, 2016 94 DISCOVERY Documents Requested by the Court for March 14 Status Conference by Alex C Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Response to First Interrogatories)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(Davis PHV, Alexander) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 29, 2016 93 Featured Case ORDER At the request of the parties, the March 14, 2016 status conference is converted from a telephonic to a live conference, with lead counsel for both sides to appear in person.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 29, 2016 92 Featured Case ORDER RE: PROCEDURE GOVERNING DISCOVERY FOR IN EXTREMIS PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 29, 2016 91 Featured Case ORDER : Pursuant to the December 21, 2015 scheduling order, the listed cases are included in Group 1 for purposes of case-specific discovery. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/29/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 24, 2016 90 Featured Case ORDER To prepare for the March 14 status conference, parties to provide a copy of the original interrogatories and requests for production that were served on the defendants in 2013 and the defendants' responses to those interrogatories and production requests by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/24/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 17, 2016 89 Featured Case ORDER At the request of the parties, the court heard arguments regarding the scope of depositions to be conducted in the statute of limitations and spoliation cases (see Exhibits A and B to the December 21, 2015 scheduling order) and the number of cases listed on Exhibit B. For the reasons stated, the parties were directed to conduct a single, full deposition of the plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B, unless the court rules to the contrary in a given case. The court deferred ruling on PSC II's request to remove cases from Exhibit B, until briefing on the anticipated summary judgment motions is completed. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 17, 2016 88 Featured Case ORDER Biomet to submit a list of the cases that remain active as of 2/1/2016 to help identify which of those cases are to be included in Group 1 for discovery purposes by 2/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/17/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 16, 2016 87 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue and J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 16, 2016 86 NOTICE of Hearing: At the request of counsel a telephonic conference was set for Tuesday 2/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 16, 2016 85 Featured Case ORDER Pursuant to paragraphs 7 & 9 of the December 21 scheduling order 3047 , two pools consisting of the oldest cases on the MDL docket and any in extremis cases identified by PSC II or Biomet and approved by the court (Groups 1 & 2) will be activated for case-specific discovery beginning 2/29/2016 and 5/20/2016 respectively. Consistent with that order, the PSC II and Biomet are DIRECTED to confer and, if possible, agree upon the procedures to be followed with respect to any in extremis cases, and to submit their proposal for the court's approval on or before 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/16/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 1, 2016 84 MEMORANDUM OF JANUARY 28, 2016 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Topics of discussion included the number of cases and motions currently pending. Biomet to review list of cases (see attached), identify which cases remain active, and file an updated list in 3:12-MD-2391. Next telephonic status conference set for March 14, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Senior Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld)[Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 28, 2016 83 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/28/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Diab, B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Written memorandum to follow. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/14/2016 at 2:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 26, 2016 82 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for January 28, 2016 status conference at 1:30 p.m. (E.S.T.).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/26/16. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 23, 2015 81 Featured Case ORDER: PSC I's request for reimbursement ( 3027 in 3:12md2391) is GRANTED, and Garretson Resolution Group is ORDERED to reimburse PSC I the $25,000.00 it withheld from the Common Benefit Expense Account. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/23/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 21, 2015 80 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Order setting discovery and dispositive deadlines. See order for specific deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/21/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 17, 2015 79 Featured Case ORDER So the court can issue its scheduling order, parties requested to submit Exhibits A and B that are to be referenced in the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/17/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 9, 2015 78 MEMORANDUM OF DECEMBER 7, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE: A brief summary of the topics discussed and the court's directives. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel to submit a written statement regarding PSC II's position on M2a-Taper cases; Biomet Defendants were directed to file a list of cases settled on or by December 7, 2015 but have yet to be dismissed. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/28/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/9/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 7, 2015 77 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/7/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward,. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. Court hears from parties. A telephonic status conference is set for 1/28/2016 at 1:30 PM (EST) before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 7, 2015 76 Featured Case AMENDED HOLDBACK ORDER RE: COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS: Order granting PSC II's Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order Re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs ( 3000 and 3002 ). Any cases that are resolved after Monday, December 7, 2015 shall be subject to a provisional six percent holdback. 3020 .. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/7/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 3, 2015 75 Featured Case ORDER: Without objection and in accordance with the court's order of 6/23/2015, the 2990 and 2991 Motions for Payment of Compensation to the Garretson Resolution Group Inc from the Biomet MDL Common Benefit Cost Fund in the amount of $18,500.00 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/3/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 1, 2015 74 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: Call in information for the status conference set 12/7/2015 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/1/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 1, 2015 73 Featured Case HOLDBACK ORDER RE: COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND COSTS: GRANTING (3002) Amended Motion re Holdback Order re Common Benefit Fees and Costs. Cases that do not have a Notice of Settlement filed into the individual case's docket on or before Monday November 30, 2015 shall be subject to a provisional 6% holdback; the Holdback Order does not apply to any cases involving pro se plaintiffs, which will be addressed on an individual case-by-case basis; the Holdback Order is provisional in nature. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel shall send a copy of the Holdback Order to the attorneys of record in the pending state court actions that PSC II is aware of. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/1/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
November 24, 2015 72 Featured Case ORDER: Motion 2963 is WITHDRAWN and has been superseded by Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order Re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs 3000 in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/24/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
November 24, 2015 71 Featured Case AMENDED EXPLANT PRESERVATION ORDER : Amended directives relating to the preservation of Explanted M2a Devices, with Biomet Retrieval Analysis Protocol (Exh. A).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/24/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
November 10, 2015 70 Plaintiffs' Executive Committee's Amended Motion and Proposed Holdback Order re: Common Benefit Fees and Costs. Any response or objection to be filed by 11/20/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. ***NOTE: THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF DE 3000 in 3:12md2391 THAT HAS BEEN SPREAD TO ALL CASES.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 15, 2015 69 MOTION for Payment of Compensation from the Biomet Common Benefit MDL Assessment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (*NOTE: This is re-filing of DE 2990 to spread it to all cases.) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 8, 2015 68 Featured Case ORDER . The Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's motion for interim common benefit fund order ( 2963 ), its brief in support ( 2973 ), and Biomet Defendants' response ( 2983 ) were filed on 9/17/15 and 10/1/15 respectively and notice was sent to all attorneys of record as were the parties' proposed scheduling orders ( 2974 & 2975 ). There's no indication the pro se litigants received these documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail copies of these documents to all pro se plaintiffs in MDL 2391. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/8/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) (cc: Order and all listed documents to all pro se litigants) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 8, 2015 67 MEMORANDUM OF OCTOBER 7, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE : A brief summary of the topics discussed and the court's directives. The next Status Conference is set for 12/7/2015 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/8/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 7, 2015 66 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty J. Presnal, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Next status conference set 12/7/15 at 1:30 PM (EDT) before Judge Miller. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 6, 2015 65 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call in information for the status conference set 10/7/15 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 9, 2015 64 Featured Case ORDER : By agreement of the parties at the September 3, 2015 status conference, all Biomet corporate entities other than Biomet, Inc., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC,Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC areDISMISSED without prejudice from each of the member cases in MDL-2391,without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/9/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(dk) Modified on 10/15/2015 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 8, 2015 63 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE : The court DIRECTED the Plaintiffs Steering Committee and Biomet defendants to submit proposed scheduling orders by 9/17/15, offering the 12/10/13 order 1118 as a possible template; DEFERRED ruling on the motion for an interim common benefit fund order 2963 , DIRECTED the Plaintiffs Steering Committee to submit a list of the settled cases that it believes should contribute to the common benefit fund by 9/17/15, GAVE the defendants to and including 10/1/15 to respond, and ADVISED that it could invite comments from plaintiffs counsel in the member cases following the parties submissions and before ruling on the motion; SET the next Status Conference set for 10/7/2015 01:30 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/8/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 3, 2015 62 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/3/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by atty N. Ward, B. Fulmer, K. Bachus, A. Diab, A. Pang Parra, J. Presnal, J. Ward, M. Nowell, L. Bronson. Defendants appeared by atty B Dart, J LaDue, E Hanig, J Winter. The next status conference is set for 10/7/15 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in South Bend, Indiana before Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 1, 2015 61 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Call in information for September 3, 2015 telephonic status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/1/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 26, 2015 60 Featured Case ORDER: Without objection, PSC I's Motion for Payment of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Expenses 2945 & 2947 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/26/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 7, 2015 59 MOTION for Payment of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees and Expenses from the Biomet Common Benefit MDL Assessment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Contributions, #2 Exhibit B Hours by Firm, #3 Exhibit C Hierarchy of Values, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit of Mrs Larbes, #5 Exhibit E Trust Ledger, #6 Exhibit F Expense Summary, #7 Exhibit G Invoices)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) ***NOTE: This is a re-entry of DE 2945 that has been spread to all the member cases. [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 28, 2015 58 Featured Case ORDER: A Status Conference is scheduled for 9/3/15 at 1:30 PM (EDT), in South Bend, Indiana. Lead counsel for parties directed to file a brief joint status report by 8/27/15. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel shall arrange a conference call to provide remote access to the conference to all plaintiffs' attorneys and shall submit a proposed order by 8/27/15 setting for the call-in information and related restrictions. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/28/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 14, 2015 57 Featured Case ORDER: GRANTING 2927 Motion to Substitute Attorney The appointment of Lawrence Jones to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee is terminated and attorney Jasper Ward IV of Jones Ward PLC is appointed to serve in his stead. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
July 6, 2015 Motion termed: (2923) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 30, 2015 56 Featured Case ORDER: GRANTING (2923) Motion to Modify Case Management Order No. 3 to the extent it seeks the appointment of an Executive Committee for PSC II and the termination of John Fiske's appointment to the Steering Committee and DENYING the motion in all other respects. Navan Ward, Brenda Fulmer, Justin Presnal, and Ahmed Diab are appointed to serve as members of the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, with Mr. Diab also serving as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel; Mr. Fiske's appointment to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee is terminated. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/30/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) Modified on 7/2/2015 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 25, 2015 55 MOTION to Substitute Jasper Ward as a Member of the Plaintiff's Steering Committee in lieu of Lawrence Jones by Jasper D Ward, IV. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 24, 2015 Motion terminated per 2925 Order. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 24, 2015 54 Featured Case ORDER : Jessica Larbes, C.P.A., shall establish the Biomet Common Benefit MDL Assessment Fund and shall serve as the Escrow Agent for the Fund; Thomas Anapol, Mark Lanier, Robert Dassow, Michelle Kranz and Justin Presnal are appointed as the attorney Fee Committee members; Sylvius von Saucken is appointed as the non-attorney compliance Fee Committee member. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/23/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. (dk) Modified on 7/2/2015 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 22, 2015 Motions terminated pursuant to 2924 Order. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 22, 2015 53 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2917 Motion to Withdraw attorney Altom Maglio as Attorney on Plaintiff's Steering Committee II in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/18/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. (dk)[Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 15, 2015 52 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's MOTION TO MODIFY (2909 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN) Case Management Order No 3 Regarding Plaintiffs' Organizational Structure. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) Modified on 7/2/2015 to term as a pending motion (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 4, 2015 51 AMENDED MOTION Appoint Escrow Agent and Fee Committee by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 4, 2015 49 Featured Case ORDER Order clarifying the 5/28/15 2914 Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/4/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 2, 2015 50 APPLICATION for WITHDRAWAL of Altom M. Maglio from Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 28, 2015 Motions Terminated: Motion to Appoint Escrow Agent and Fee Committee termed per Order 2914 in 3:12md2391. [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 28, 2015 48 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF ESCROW AGENT AND FEE COMMITTEE: The Court declines to enter the proposed order on 2878 motion to appoint an escrow agent and a fee committee. PSC I shall have three weeks, to and including 6/19/15, to file an amended motion to appoint an escrow agent and fee committee. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/28/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 27, 2015 47 Featured Case CASE MANAGENENT ORDER NO. 3 : The court: (1) FINDS that Biomet's actions during settlement negotiations and mediation were permissible under the Master Settlement Agreement and did not constitute bad faith; (2) DENIES attorney Gregg Borri's request for discovery (Doc. Nos. 2887 and 2889 ); (3) GRANTS the motion to substitute Justin Presnal as a member of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee in lieu of Wayne Fisher (Doc. No. 2895 ); (4) GRANTS the motion to terminate the existing Plaintiffs Steering Committee, effective June 1, 2015 (Doc. No. 2890 ) ; (5) APPOINTS the following attorneys to the new Plaintiffs Steering Committee (PSC II), effective June 1, 2015--Brenda Fulmer (Co-Lead Counsel), Navan Ward (Co-Lead Counsel), J. Kyle Bachus, Ahmed Diab, John Fiske, Lawrence Jones, William Jordan, Altom Maglio, Amber Pang Parra, and Justin Presnal; (6) DIRECTS attorneys Ahmed Diab and John Fiske to inform the court, PSC II, and Biomet's Lead Counsel by June 15, 2015 which of them will serve as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel; (7) DIRECTS the current Plaintiffs Steering Committee (PSC I) and Biomet to provide PSC II with copies of Plaintiff Fact Sheets in all cases remaining after settlement; (8) DECLINES to enter a census order or Lone Pine order at this time; and (9) invites PSC II to submit a new proposed common benefit fund order by September 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/27/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 21, 2015 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF May 18, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE: The parties addressed concerns relating to the mediation process, status of discovery, and various issues facing the plaintiffs' organizational structure following settlement, including future funding and the composition of the PSC. The court took the matters and pending motions to appoint an escrow agent and fee committee, to terminate the current PSC, and to substitute attorney Justin Presnal for Wayne Fisher on the PSC under advisement. The next status conference will be set by separate order at a later date.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/21/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 18, 2015 45 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/18/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow, B. Fulmer, M. Lanier, N. Ward, A. Diaz, K. Bachus, G. Borri, J. Lowe, L. Bronson, and J. Presnal. Dft appeared by atty B. Dart, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, and J. Winter. Court hears from parties. Written Memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 15, 2015 44 Letter dated 5/14/15 from Terrence Smith re: 2874 . Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 14, 2015 43 Letter from Erin Linder Hanig re: remaining cases and attorneys. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 14, 2015 42 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Call-in information for May 18, 2015 Status Conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/14/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 12, 2015 40 Plaintiffs Steering Committee's MOTION to Appoint Escrow Agent and Fee Committee (filed per Order 2285 in 3:12md2391). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 12, 2015 39 Featured Case ORDER The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Motion to Appoint Escrow Agent and Fee Committee (Doc. No. 2878 in 3:12md2391) in each of the individual member cases. The Court will defer ruling on the motion for two weeks. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/12/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 11, 2015 41 Letter dated 5/7/15 from Plaintiff's attorney M David Riggs regarding DE 2874 in 3:12md2391. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 6, 2015 38 Letter dated 5/5/2015 from plaintiff's attorney Scott D. Perlmuter regarding 2874 Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 5, 2015 37 Letter dated 5/4/2015 from plaintiff's atty John Ferris Dow regarding 2874 . Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 4, 2015 36 Featured Case ORDER: At the request of the parties, Status Conference previously set for 5/21/2015 is RESET to 5/18/2015 09:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/4/2015. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
May 1, 2015 35 Letter from John D Winter in response to Greg Boris letter 2874 and Jeffrey J Lowe 2876 Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 30, 2015 34 Letter from Jeffrey J Lowe joining the requests set forth in Mr. Borri's letter of 4/24/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 28, 2015 31 Featured Case ORDER: In light of the Master Settlement Agreement many of the attorneys now on the Plaintiffs Steering Committee will soon have no remaining constituent cases in this MDL. Plaintiffs Steering Committee members who will be without cases are invited to request termination of their PSC appointment by 5/15/15. The court has also received a letter from attorney Gregg Borri who represents the plaintiff in case 3:12cv614, regarding Biomet's approach in carrying out the Master Settlement Agreement. The court also received a responsive letter from Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel Thomas R Anapol offering the perspective of the leadership of the Steering Committee. Both letters (as well as any response from Biomet) are directed to be entered on the master docket. The issues Mr. Borri raises will be placed on the agenda for the 5/21/15 status conference. Mr. Borri is invited to attend that conference in person.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 27, 2015 33 Letter from Thomas R Anapol in response to 2874 Letter from Gregg Borri Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 27, 2015 32 Letter from Gregg J Borri to Judge Miller re: Kelly Chadwick in constituent case 3:12cv614, questioning the approach Biomet has taken in carrying out the Master Settlement Agreement. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 22, 2015 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF APRIL 21, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE Although applications for a new Plaintiffs Steering Committee (PSC) were solicited, no applications were received. Given the number of cases remaining after the settlement process concludes, a new PSC is needed. Counsel for defendants to submit a list of all remaining cases and the attorneys of record in those cases. The court will select a new PSC from that list, and will enter a revised scheduling order and a new Common Benefit Fund order upon appointment of the new PSC. Next status conference set for May 21, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/22/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 21, 2015 29 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow, N. Ward, J. Fiske. Dft appeared by atty B. Dart, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Winter. The next Status Conference is set for 5/21/2015 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 16, 2015 28 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE : Call in information for the April 21, 2015 telephonic case management conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/16/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 18, 2015 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF MARCH 16, 2015 STATUS CONFERENCE: The court deferred ruling on the request for early termination of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (PSC) appointments; entered an order inviting new applications for the PSC (application deadline is April 17, 2015); and directed the parties to file an updated status report regarding discovery and the Common Benefit Fund. The 2013 scheduling order 1118 will be reinstated beginning 45 days after appointment of a new PSC, with dates to be adjusted to fit the pre-existing time limits. Next status conference set for April 21, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in South Bend before Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/18/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 17, 2015 26 Featured Case ORDER RE: APPLICATIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS STEERING COMMITTEE The court defers ruling on the PSC's request for early termination, and will accept applications for all positions on the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee from now until April 17, 2015. Any objections thereto should be filed by May 1, 2015. Details regarding the application process are provided in the attached order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/17/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 16, 2015 25 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/16/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow, B. Fulmer, J. Ward, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Winter. The next Status Conference is set for 4/21/15 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 12, 2015 24 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Call in information for March 16, 2015 telephonic case management conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/12/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
February 2, 2015 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/16/2015 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 30, 2015 23 TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow, R. Meadow. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter. The court GRANTED pltfs' oral request for additional time to mediate; EXTENDED the deadline to complete mediation for 30 days; AFFORDED pltfs to 3/2/15 to accept or reject the settlement offer/aggeement in the individual cases. A status conference is set for 3/16/15 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in the third floor courtroom in South Bend. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 28, 2015 22 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Call in information for January 30, 3015 telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/28/15. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
January 22, 2015 21 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/22/2015 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/30/15 at 11:00 AM (EST) was confirmed. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 30, 2014 20 MEMORANDUM OF STATUS CONFERENCE , : Parties DIRECTED to file a joint status report by 1/22/15; the next telephonic status conference is set 1/30/15 at 11:00 a.m. EST. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/30/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 23, 2014 19 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/23/2014 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plas appeared by atty R. Dassow, T. Anapol (by phone), M. Lanier (by phone). Dfts appeared by atty J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Winter (by phone). Joint Status Report due 1/22/15; Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/30/2015 at 11:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written Memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) Modified on 12/24/2014 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 22, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER REAPPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' ORGANIZATIONAL STRUCTURE: Order appointing/reappointing Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, Executive Committee, Lead, and Liaison Counsel effective Jan 1, 2015-Dec 31, 2015.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/22/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 16, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE : Call in information for December 23, 2014 telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/16/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
December 15, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER : At the request of the parties, the telephonic status conference on Tuesday, December 23, 2014 will commence at 11:00 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. ***NOTE: ONLY THE TIME HAS CHANGED***. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/15/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
November 18, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER: GRANTING (2789) Motion to Extend Master Settlement Agreement Mediation Resolution Deadline in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN. The mediation deadline is extended from 12/5/14 to 1/30/2015. Any mediated case not resolved by 1/30/15, subject to the aggregate settlement percentage requirements will be remanded pursuant to an appropriate order of the court. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/18/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 20, 2014 14 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/20/2014, before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow. Dft appeared by atty B. Dart, J. LaDue, E. Hanig, J. Winter (by phone). The court will accept applications for appointment or reappointment to plaintiffs' organizational structure (lead and liaison counsel, Executive Committee, and Steering Committee) until 11/18/14, Any objections to the appointment or reappointment should be made in writing and filed by 11/28/14; Status Report due by 12/8/2014; Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/23/2014 at 1:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.) (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
October 17, 2014 13 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Call-in information for 10/20/2014 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/17/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
September 19, 2014 12 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINTING FUND ADMINISTRATOR : GRANTING 2756 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN) MOTION for Settlement -AGREED MOTION TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINT FUND ADMINISTRATOR filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jd) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 14, 2014 11 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/14/2014 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, M. Lanier, R. Dassow. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter. Parties moving forward pursuant to settlement agreement. Status reports due on 9/18/14 and 10/14/14. Next status conference scheduled for 10/20/2014 at 9:30 AM (EDT) with executive session, if necessary, at 9:00 AM (EDT) in South Bend. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
August 11, 2014 10 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Call in information for 8/14/2014 telephonic status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/11/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 12, 2014 9 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/12/2014 before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Pla appeared by atty T. Anapol, R. Dassow. Dft appeared by atty J. Winter, J. LaDue, E. Hanig. Parties moving forward pursuant to settlement agreement. Plaintiffs' liaison counsel to advise the court regarding status of motions to remand in 3:13cv251, 3:13cv439, 3:13cv844, 3:13cv1359, and 3:14cv1610 by 6/19/14. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/14/2014 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
June 9, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Call in information for 6/12/14 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/9/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 21, 2014 7 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2014 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys T. Anapol, R. Dassow, M. Lanier, D. Kreis, R. Meadow. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Parties moving forward pursuant to settlement agreement. Parties directed to advise the court regarding status of motions to remand in 3:13cv251, 3:13cv439, 3:13cv844, and 3:13cv1359 in light of the Settlement Agreement. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2014 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 14, 2014 6 Featured Case QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding selection of Plaintiffs' Lien Resolution Administrator (LRA) and authority to act. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/14/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
April 2, 2014 5 Featured Case CATEGORIZATION ORDER Under Section 2.(d) Categorization of Cases pursuant to the Master Settlement Agreement 1317 , categorization of all Group 1 cases must be submitted on or before 4/18/14 and the categorization of all Group 2 cases must be submitted by 8/8/14.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/2/14. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-CAN et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 10, 2014 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of All Defendants (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 10, 2014 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John David LaDue on behalf of All Defendants (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 6, 2014 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 6, 2014 2 NOTICE by Sharon Vanhoose Notice of Related Case (Ward PHV, Navan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]
March 6, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2295733.), filed by Sharon Vanhoose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward PHV, Navan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanhoose v. Biomet Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Michelle M Tessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet US Reconstruction LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Michelle M Tessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Inc
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Emalie L Rott
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Stephanie A Koltookian
Represented By: Thomas J Joensen
Represented By: Michelle M Tessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Vanhoose
Represented By: Makesha N Nowell PHV
Represented By: Navan Ward PHV, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?