Harding et al v. Claborns Elite Lawns LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marlen Harding
Defendant: Claborns Elite Lawns LLC, April Claborn and John Brian Claborn
Case Number: 5:2018cv00910
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren E Braddy on behalf of Marlen Harding(Individually), Marlen Harding(on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Braddy, Lauren)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by William C Alexander on behalf of Marlen Harding(Individually), Marlen Harding(on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Alexander, William)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Clifton Alexander; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren Elizabeth Braddy. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/31/18. (jw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Elizabeth Braddy Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2802627 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lauren Elizabeth Braddy)(McIntyre, Noble)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2802614 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William Clifton Alexander)(McIntyre, Noble)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, April Claborn answer due 11/13/2018; John Brian Claborn answer due 11/13/2018; Claborns Elite Lawns LLC answer due 11/13/2018.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/23/18. (jw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Scimeca, Peter)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter L Scimeca on behalf of All Defendants (Scimeca, Peter)
October 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlen Harding(Individually), Marlen Harding(on behalf of all others similarly situated). All Defendants. (Alexander, William)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy A Thurman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thurman, Jeremy)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE from the Court #4 Entry of Appearance, STRICKEN due to erroneous filing. Counsel to refile Entry of Appearance using counsel's correct user account. (nv)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble) STRICKEN Per Notice from the Court on 09/21/18 (nv).
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to April Claborn, John Brian Claborn, Claborns Elite Lawns LLC. (kr)
September 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2774175. (McIntyre, Noble)
September 17, 2018 Docket Annotation: Emailed counsel regarding filing fee. (kr)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against April Claborn, John Brian Claborn, Claborns Elite Lawns LLC filed by Marlen Harding(Individually), Marlen Harding(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Consent to Join Wage Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding et al v. Claborns Elite Lawns LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claborns Elite Lawns LLC
Represented By: Peter L Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Claborn
Represented By: Peter L Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brian Claborn
Represented By: Peter L Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlen Harding
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Represented By: Lauren E Braddy
Represented By: William C Alexander
Represented By: Jeremy A Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?