SIR Montclair Parc LLC v. Pryor
Plaintiff: SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Defendant: Stephanie Pryor
Case Number: 5:2018cv00940
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. (fully set out in order) By direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/20/2018. (sr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mail sent to Stephanie Pryor (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (kmt)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 10/15/18. (mc)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Maggard, Darquita)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Pryor. (kmt)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number SC-2018-4657-N filed by Stephanie Pryor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIR Montclair Parc LLC v. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Represented By: Darquita LeAn T Maggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?