United States of America v. Pelfrey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Rosemarie Pelfrey, Pelfrey Investments Company LLC, Omega Enterprises LLC and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 5:2018cv00945
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Ray Pelfrey), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (nv)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Pelfrey), and against Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America.(Marks, Lauren)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. (Marks, Lauren)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002) waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. Pelfrey Investments Company LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/1/2018. (md)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Tamica H Daniel on behalf of United States of America (Daniel, Tamica)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Card on behalf of United States of America (Card, Daniel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by United States of America (Marks, Lauren)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Marks on behalf of United States of America (Marks, Lauren)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (ac)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pelfrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemarie Pelfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelfrey Investments Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel J Card
Represented By: Lauren Marks
Represented By: Tamica H Daniel
Represented By: Ronald R Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?