United States of America v. Moutaw et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Rachell Moutaw Rigney, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners, Briana Moutaw Bridendolph, John Doe, Z M, Brittany Moutaw, Becky Renae Moutaw, Roger Dale Moutaw, Pottawatomie County Treasurer, Rebecca Moutaw and Oklahoma Tax Commission
Guardian Ad Litem: Joey D Schmidt
Case Number: 5:2018cv00957
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Foreclosure against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Note, #2 Exhibit 2-Note, #3 Exhibit 3-Note, #4 Exhibit 4-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit 5-Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6-Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7-Security Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8-Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9-Financing Statement, #10 Exhibit 10-Financing Statement, #11 Exhibit 11-Verification)(Sewell, Kay)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/30/18. (wh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint)(Sewell, Kay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners served on 10/4/2018. (Sewell, Kay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Pottawatomie County Treasurer served on 10/4/2018. (Sewell, Kay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Oklahoma Tax Commission served on 10/3/2018. (Sewell, Kay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. John Doe served on 10/14/2018. (Sewell, Kay)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Becky Renae Moutaw served on 10/14/2018. (Sewell, Kay)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLAIMER by Oklahoma Tax Commission.(Wyatt, Anna)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Anna May Wyatt on behalf of Oklahoma Tax Commission (Wyatt, Anna)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem.. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/09/18. (wh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem and Brief in Support by United States of America. (Sewell, Kay)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kay D Sewell on behalf of United States of America (Sewell, Kay)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Briana Moutaw Bridendolph, John Doe, Becky Renae Moutaw, Brittany Moutaw, Rebecca Moutaw, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners, Pottawatomie County Treasurer, Rachell Moutaw Rigney. (em)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Briana Moutaw Bridendolph, John Doe, Z M, Becky Renae Moutaw, Brittany Moutaw, Rebecca Moutaw, Roger Dale Moutaw, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners, Pottawatomie County Treasurer, Rachell Moutaw Rigney filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note, #3 Exhibit 3 - Note, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mtg, #5 Exhibit 5 - Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Security Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 - Financing Statement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Financing Statement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Moutaw verification, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moutaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachell Moutaw Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Moutaw Bridendolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Moutaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Renae Moutaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Dale Moutaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Moutaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Tax Commission
Represented By: Anna May Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kay D Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Joey D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?