Breitling v. Frontier Drilling LLC

Plaintiff: Scott Breitling
Defendant: Frontier Drilling LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00982
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Amer. w/Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018 09:45 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 12/20/2018. (md)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Frontier Drilling LLC.(Voth, Lauren)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Maule, Byrona)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Voth, Lauren)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Byrona J Maule on behalf of Frontier Drilling LLC (Maule, Byrona)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Frontier Drilling LLC . (Voth, Lauren)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L Campbell on behalf of Frontier Drilling LLC (Campbell, Catherine)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Symcox Voth on behalf of Frontier Drilling LLC (Voth, Lauren)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Scott Breitling. (Addison, D)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Scott Breitling (Addison, D)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Scott Breitling (Roper, Leah)
October 5, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2786872. (Voth, Lauren)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5048 filed by Frontier Drilling LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Petition), #2 Exhibit 2 (Return of Service), #3 Exhibit 3 (EOA D.Colby Addison, #4 Exhibit 4 (Docket Sheet), #5 Exhibit 5 EOA Roper, #6 Exhibit 6 (Email Confirmation Accepting Service), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breitling v. Frontier Drilling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Drilling LLC
Represented By: Byrona J Maule
Represented By: Lauren Symcox Voth
Represented By: Catherine L Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Breitling
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?