Adams v. Zang

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Adams
Defendant: Ziqian Zang
Case Number: 5:2018cv00997
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Amer. w/Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Guadalupe Adams. (Monismith, Pete)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendant shall file his answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 11/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/07/2018. (lam)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Application for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ziqian Zang. (Hanna, Lauren)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren B Hanna on behalf of Ziqian Zang (Hanna, Lauren)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Don S Strong on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Strong, Don)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE (other) by Guadalupe Adams (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Pete M Monismith on behalf of Guadalupe Adams (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2789628. (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER counsel for plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 10/15/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/11/2018. (lam)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ziqian Zang. (nv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ziqian Zang filed by Guadalupe Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Zang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ziqian Zang
Represented By: Lauren B Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Adams
Represented By: Pete M Monismith
Represented By: Don S Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?