McDonald et al v. Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC et al

Plaintiff: Cory McDonald
Defendant: Gary Gore and Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01010
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Collective Action Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pittman, Brock)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hedgpeth, Travis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Pittman, Brock)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock Z Pittman on behalf of All Defendants (Pittman, Brock)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa M Molsbee on behalf of All Defendants (Molsbee, Lisa)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas P Howell, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Howell, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by J Clay Christensen on behalf of All Defendants (Christensen, J)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Travis M Hedgpeth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hedgpeth, Travis)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cory McDonald(individually), Cory McDonald(on behalf of all others similarly situated). All Defendants. (Hedgpeth, Travis)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Hegpeth shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before November 8, 2018 and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/18/2018. (jb)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2789737 by Cory McDonald(individually), Cory McDonald(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Horton, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven T Horton on behalf of Cory McDonald(individually), Cory McDonald(on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Horton, Steven)
October 11, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2789593. (Horton, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gary Gore, Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC. (kmt)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Gore, Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC filed by Cory McDonald(individually), Cory McDonald(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald et al v. Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gore
Represented By: Thomas P Howell, IV
Represented By: Brock Z Pittman
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Lisa M Molsbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gore Nitrogen Pumping Service LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Howell, IV
Represented By: Brock Z Pittman
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Lisa M Molsbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory McDonald
Represented By: Steven T Horton
Represented By: Travis M Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?