Trumbull Insurance Company v. Dennis et al
Plaintiff: Trumbull Insurance Company
Defendant: Matthew Stephen Dennis and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv01021
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. United States of America answer or other responsive pldg due 1/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/14/2018. (llg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by United States of America. (Maule, Scott) Modified on 12/14/2018 (llg).
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott A Maule on behalf of United States of America (Maule, Scott)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Trumbull Insurance Company. United States of America served on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Receipt for Certified Mail)(Sander, Lori)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lori A Sander (Sander, Lori)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lori A Sander on behalf of Trumbull Insurance Company (Sander, Lori)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew Stephen Dennis, United States of America (U.S. Attorney Western District) (kr)
October 16, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2792418. (Sander, Lori)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Stephen Dennis, United States of America filed by Trumbull Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trumbull Insurance Company v. Dennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Stephen Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Scott A Maule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori A Sander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?