Newell et al v. Gibson and Reynolds PC et al
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Newell and Terry Newell
Defendant: Steven Lane Schollenbarger, James Reynolds and Gibson and Reynolds PC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01028
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants James Reynolds and Gibson & Reynolds, PC's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendants James Reynolds and Gibson & Reynolds, PC's Motion to Dismiss on or before December 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/28/2018. (ks)
November 27, 2018 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell. (Federman, William)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. (fully set out in order) By direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/20/2018. (sr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Gibson and Reynolds PC, James Reynolds. (McConnell-Corbyn, Laura)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Gibson and Reynolds PC, James Reynolds . (McConnell-Corbyn, Laura)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley L Powell on behalf of Gibson and Reynolds PC, James Reynolds (Powell, Ashley)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura McConnell-Corbyn on behalf of Gibson and Reynolds PC, James Reynolds (McConnell-Corbyn, Laura)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell. James Reynolds served on 10/19/2018. (Federman, William)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell. Steven Lane Schollenbarger served on 10/19/2018. (Federman, William)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell. Gibson and Reynolds PC served on 10/19/2018. (Federman, William)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to James Reynolds. (kmt)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicole E Johnson on behalf of Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell (Johnson, Nicole)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart W Emmons on behalf of Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell (Emmons, Stuart)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell (Federman, William)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell.(Federman, William)
October 18, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2794478. (Federman, William)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gibson and Reynolds PC, Steven Lane Schollenbarger. (kmt)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gibson and Reynolds PC, Steven Lane Schollenbarger filed by Jo Ann Newell, Terry Newell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell et al v. Gibson and Reynolds PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Newell
Represented By: Nicole E Johnson
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Stuart W Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Newell
Represented By: Nicole E Johnson
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Stuart W Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lane Schollenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Reynolds
Represented By: Laura McConnell-Corbyn
Represented By: Ashley L Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson and Reynolds PC
Represented By: Laura McConnell-Corbyn
Represented By: Ashley L Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?