Reitmire v. United States
Plaintiff: Jerry Levi Reitmire
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 5:2018cv01035
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2019 11:20 AM before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 1/30/2019. (jb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by United States. (Evans, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Don Evans, Jr on behalf of United States (Evans, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Levi Reitmire as to United States. (kmt)
November 2, 2018 Docket Annotation: Placed 3 copies of #5 Summons per defendant, 4 copies of #1 Complaint, 1 USM-285 form, and 1 copy of #3 Order Granting IFP in US Marshals box. (kmt)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States. (kmt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 2 SUMMONS(ES) by Jerry Levi Reitmire. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/23/2018. (jb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Levi Reitmire. (kmt)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States filed by Jerry Levi Reitmire. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 - Admin Tort Claim March 13, 2017, #3 Exhibit 2 - Admin Tort Claim April 27, 2017, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Standard Form 95, #5 Exhibit 4 - Admin Tort Claim October 23, 2017, #6 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Medical Record of plaintiff, #7 Exhibit 6 - Other medical records Nov 03, 2016, #8 Exhibit 7 - Feb 07, 2014 Veterans Health Benefit Handbook, #9 Exhibit 8 - Feb 25, 2014 Audio Appointment Cancelled, #10 Exhibit 9 - March 20, 2014 no show Radiology, #11 Exhibit 10 - March 20, 2014 Appointment Radiology, #12 Exhibit 11 - OMR Jul 30, 2014 Appointment Mental Health Cancelled, #13 Exhibit 12 - OMR Aug 05, 2014 Appointment Mental Health Cancelled, #14 Exhibit 13 - OMR Nov 28, 2014 - DEC 16, 2014 Primary Care Secure Messaging, #15 Exhibit 14 - OMR Dec 17, 2014 Periodic Veterans share experiences at Lawton forum, #16 Exhibit 15 - OMR Dec 2014 Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act 2014, #17 Exhibit 16 - OMR Jan 09, 2015 Primary Care Secure Messaging, #18 Exhibit 17 - OMR Jan 09, 2015 Appointment Law PC Clinic, #19 Exhibit 18 - OMR Feb 03 2015 Appointment, #20 Exhibit 19 - OMR Feb 05, 2015 Appointment Radiology, #21 Exhibit 20 - OMR May 25, 2015 - May 28, 2015 Primary Care Secure Messaging, #22 Exhibit 21 - OMR Jun, 2015 Veterans Choice Program, #23 Exhibit 22 - OMR Sep 04, 2015 Appointment OPT Gen, #24 Exhibit 23- OMR June 2015 Primary Care Secure Messaging, #25 Exhibit 24 - OMR Jun 19, 2015 - Jun 23, 2015 Primary Care Secure Messaging, #26 Exhibit 25 - OMR Jun 22, 2015 Appointment Mental Health Cancelled, #27 Exhibit 26 - OMR Jun 22, 2015 Final Date of Prescription & Delivery, #28 Exhibit 27 - OMR Jun 27, 2015 Primary Care Secure Messaging; Injuries & Response, #29 Exhibit 28 - OMR Jun 30, 2015 Patient Discharge Instructions, #30 Exhibit 29 - OMR 2 Jul 2015 Veterans Choice, #31 Exhibit 30 - OMR 11 Jul 2015 VAHC (AGENT CASHIER 04C), #32 Exhibit 31 - OMR 13 Jul 2015 - 15 JUL 2015 VAHC, #33 Exhibit 32 - OMR 14 Jul 2015 VAHC COMPLETE-UPDATE, #34 Exhibit 33 - OMR 15 Jul 2015 NO SHOW APT 15 JUL 2015 VAHC ORIBO & VAHC XRAY, #35 Exhibit 34 - OMR 25 Jul 2015 Plaintiff CANCELLED APT Mental Health, #36 Exhibit 35 - OMR 11 Aug 2015 VAHC (AGENT CASHIER 04C), #37 Exhibit 36 - OMR 26 Aug 2015 Consult to Ortho VAHC, #38 Exhibit 37 - OMR 4 Sept 2015 APT 30 SEP 2015 VAHC EYE PLASTIC, #39 Exhibit 38 - OMR 5 Sep 2015 VAHC payments (27 JUN 2015 Foot), #40 Exhibit 39 - OMR 11 Sep 2015 VAHC (AGENT CASHIER 04C), #41 Exhibit 40 - OMR 30 Sep 2015 Discharge Instructions, #42 Exhibit 41 - OMR 16 Oct 2015 Personalized Veterans Health Handbook, #43 Exhibit 42 - OMR 19 Oct 2015 Influenza Vaccine Clinic VAHC, #44 Exhibit 43 - OMR 25 Jan 2016 Affordable Care ACT Notice, #45 Exhibit 44 - OMR 12 Jul 2016 LABORATORY, #46 Exhibit 45 - OMR 12 Jul 2016 Mental Health VAHC, #47 Exhibit 46 - OMR 18 Jul 2016 XRAY VAHC, #48 Exhibit 47 - 19 Jul 2015 VAHC (AGENT CASHIER 04C), #49 Exhibit 48 - OMR 25 Jul 2016 APT XRAY VAHC, #50 Exhibit 49 - OMR 9 Aug 2016 V AHC Migraine Headache Discharge Instructions, #51 Exhibit 50 - OMR 18 Aug 2016 V AHC Consult Home Base Primary Care (VAHC-HBPC), #52 Exhibit 51 - OMR 13 Sep Apt 1 Nov 2016 VAHC MHC Cancelled by HBPC, #53 Exhibit 52 - OMR 14 Sep 2016 HBPC 27 SEP 2016 & 26 SEP 2016 HBPC Problem List, #54 Exhibit 53 - OMR 28 Sep 2016 VAHC Transcutaneous Electrical Nerve stimulation (TENS), #55 Exhibit 54 - OMR 28 Sep 2016 PATIENT HANDBOOK, #56 Exhibit 55 - OMR 30 Sep 2016 CHECK Deduction for Medication, #57 Exhibit 56 - OMR 30 Sep 2016 VAHC ADVANCED DIRECTIVE, #58 Exhibit 57 - OMR 4 Oct 2016 (NEW)- VA FORM, #59 Exhibit 58 - OMR 1 Nov 2016 MED RECONCILLATION & NOTES by VAHC, #60 Exhibit 59 - OMR 23 Dec 2016 APT AUDIOLOGY VAHC, #61 Exhibit 60 - OMR 30 Dec 2016 Affordable Care Act, #62 Exhibit 61 - OMR 3 Jan 2017 VAHC Meds Reconciliation, #63 Exhibit 62 - OMR 11 Jan 2017 VAHC XRAY Work Copy and 12 Jan 2017 XRAY Report, #64 Exhibit 63 - OMR 31 Jan 2017 VAHC Outpatient Medications Questions to VAHC, #65 Exhibit 64 - OMR 6 Feb 2017 Consult for Optometry VAHC, #66 Exhibit 65 - OMR 2 Mar 2017 VAHC Medication Reconcilation, #67 Exhibit 66 - 2017 PROSTHETICS ORDERED & 10 MAY 2017 PROSTHETICS, #68 Exhibit 67 - OMR 11 Aug 2017 VAHC (AGENT CASHIER 04C) & 17 SEP 2017, #69 Exhibit 68 - 2017 VAHC Secure Messaging, #70 Exhibit 69 - 2017 VAHC HBPC NURSING NOTE, #71 Exhibit 70 - 2018 VAHC Health VA Video Connect, #72 Exhibit 71 - 2018 VAHC Orthotic or ProstheticeDevice; ORDER, #73 Exhibit 72 - 2018 DISCHARGED VAHC HBPC, #74 Exhibit 73 - 2017 Complaints and Concerns, #75 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reitmire v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Robert Don Evans, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Levi Reitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?