Dungan v. Veterans Affairs Department of
Plaintiff: Charles N Dungan
Defendant: Veterans Affairs Department of
Case Number: 5:2018cv01038
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT titled, "Itemized Cost Monthly - for Charles Dungan" re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles N Dungan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Superior Home Care LLC Plan and Progress Note, #2 Attachment 2 - Letter from VA dated 050118, #3 Attachment 3 - Progress Note, #4 Attachment 4 - Physical Disability Parking Application, #5 Attachment 5 - Note written by Treasa Karr dated 121218, #6 Attachment 6 - Forms of Identification, #7 Envelope)(nv)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court sua sponte grants an extension and orders Plaintiff to cure his deficient ifp application by 12/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/6/18. (lb)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must supplement his application by providing a complete itemized response to Question No. 5 on or before 11/27/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/6/18. (lb)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 1 SUMMONS(ES) by Charles N Dungan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles N Dungan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Veterans Affairs Department of filed by Charles N Dungan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter from US Dept. of VA dated 050118, #2 Attachment 2- Claim for Damage Injury or Death Form 95, #3 Attachment 3- Letter from Treasa Brown dated 052218, #4 Attachment 4- Physical Disability Parking Application DPS, #5 Attachment 5 -Medical Record Progress Notes, #6 Attachment 6- Drivers License, #7 Civil Cover Sheet), #8 Envelope) (nv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dungan v. Veterans Affairs Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles N Dungan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?