Pryor v. SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pryor
Defendant: SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01047
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER this action is remanded to the District Court of Cleveland County...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/21/2018. (cla)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Stephanie Pryor. (nv)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/26/2018. (cps)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephanie Pryor. (nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cleveland County District Court, case number SC-2018-5265 filed by Stephanie Pryor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIR Montclair Parc LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?