Morris et al v. Zweig et al
Plaintiff: Rita M Morris and Timothy A Morris
Defendant: Comanche County Hospital Authority, Jeffrey L Zweig and Richard J Boatsman
Case Number: 5:2018cv01048
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffrey L Zweig.(Condren, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Richard J Boatsman.(Stanley, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Comanche County Hospital Authority, d/b/a Comanche County Memorial Hospital filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brooks, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Defendant, Richard Boatsman, M.D.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Richard Boatsman, M.D. shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Complaint on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/26/2018. (ks)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Defendant Jeffrey L. Zweig, M.D.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Jeffrey L. Zweig, M.D. shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Complaint on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/26/2018. (ks)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Richard J Boatsman. (Stanley, Richard)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Jeffrey L Zweig. (Condren, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Russell L Hendrickson on behalf of Jeffrey L Zweig (Hendrickson, Russell)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by John C Condren on behalf of Jeffrey L Zweig (Condren, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard G Stanley on behalf of Richard J Boatsman (Stanley, Richard)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Comanche County Hospital Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOTC)(Branscum, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Danielle L Mosesman on behalf of Comanche County Hospital Authority (Mosesman, Danielle)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by David A Branscum on behalf of Comanche County Hospital Authority (Branscum, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Glen D Huff on behalf of Comanche County Hospital Authority (Huff, Glen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Debra A Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Debra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy A Morris, Rita M Morris. Richard J Boatsman served on 11/3/2018. (Brooks, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy A Morris, Rita M Morris. Comanche County Hospital Authority served on 11/1/2018. (Brooks, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy A Morris, Rita M Morris. Jeffrey L Zweig served on 11/1/2018. (Brooks, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. (fully set out in order) By direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/20/2018. (sr)
October 26, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE 5:18-cv-01048-M Morris et al v. Zweig et al; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2800075. (Brooks, Michael)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard J Boatsman, Comanche County Hospital Authority, Jeffrey L Zweig. (kmt)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard J Boatsman, Comanche County Hospital Authority, Jeffrey L Zweig filed by Timothy A Morris, Rita M Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Zweig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita M Morris
Represented By: Debra A Brooks
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A Morris
Represented By: Debra A Brooks
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comanche County Hospital Authority
Represented By: Danielle L Mosesman
Represented By: David A Branscum
Represented By: Glen D Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L Zweig
Represented By: John C Condren
Represented By: Russell L Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Boatsman
Represented By: Richard G Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?