Cathey v. Rose State College et al
Plaintiff: William Reeves Cathey
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe, Joey Duvall, Rose State College Board of Regents, Richard Andrews, Rose State College, Midwest City Police Department The, Alberta Nutter, Jeane Webb and Kim Q LNU
Case Number: 5:2018cv01050
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash by Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education. (Bunson, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy M Bunson on behalf of Oklahoma State Regents for Higher Education (Bunson, Timothy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Rose State College. (ac)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 1 SUMMONS(ES) by William Reeves Cathey. (ac)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Andrews, Jane Doe, John Doe, Joey Duvall, Kim Q LNU, Midwest City Police Department The, Alberta Nutter, Rose State College, Rose State College Board of Regents, Jeane Webb filed by William Reeves Cathey.(ac)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement by William Reeves Cathey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Letter)(ac)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Stay or Motion for Continuance. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/29/2018. (md)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ~ granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that Plaintiff is financially unable to prepay the fees of this proceeding or give security for payment of the fees. Plaintiff is authorized to proceed without prepayment of the fees or giving security for such payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/26/2018. (dwl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Order by William Reeves Cathey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit1-Doctor Notes)(ac)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Reeves Cathey. (ac)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Andrews, Jane Doe, John Doe, Joey Duvall, Kim Q LNU, Midwest City Police Department The, Alberta Nutter, Rose State College, Rose State College Board of Regents, Jeane Webb filed by William Reeves Cathey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cathey v. Rose State College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reeves Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose State College Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose State College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest City Police Department The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberta Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeane Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Q LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?