Bill G Perry Family Design LLC et al v. Sand Properties LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bill G Perry Family Design LLC and Billy Perry, Jr
Defendant: Derek Shannon, New Generation Homes LLC, Matthew Anderson, John Does and Sand Properties LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01082
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boatright Family v Reservation Center)(Gatliff, John)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Anderson, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon. (White, Edward)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew Anderson, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon.(White, Edward)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L White on behalf of Matthew Anderson, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon (White, Edward)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry D Green on behalf of Matthew Anderson, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon (Green, Kerry)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 SUBPOENA Returned Executed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC as to New Generation Homes LLC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC. New Generation Homes LLC served on 11/10/2018. (Cole, C)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC. Matthew Anderson served on 11/10/2018. (Cole, C)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC. Derek Shannon served on 11/8/2018. (Cole, C)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC. Sand Properties LLC served on 11/7/2018. (Gatliff, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) (ml)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Gatliff, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson, Kindra)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ginger K Casper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Casper, Ginger)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John E Gatliff, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gatliff, John)
November 5, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2804948. (Gatliff, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew Anderson, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon. (ml)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matthew Anderson, John Does, New Generation Homes LLC, Sand Properties LLC, Derek Shannon filed by Billy Perry, Jr, Bill G Perry Family Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Know Copyright Infringement, #2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiffs Designs and Registration Information Without, #3 Exhibit 3-Single Use Plans Sold by Plaintiffs to the Defendants, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bill G Perry Family Design LLC et al v. Sand Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Shannon
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Generation Homes LLC
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Anderson
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Properties LLC
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill G Perry Family Design LLC
Represented By: C Craig Cole
Represented By: John E Gatliff, II
Represented By: Kindra N Dotson
Represented By: Ginger K Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Perry, Jr
Represented By: C Craig Cole
Represented By: John E Gatliff, II
Represented By: Kindra N Dotson
Represented By: Ginger K Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?