Diversified Financial LLC v. Baker et al

Plaintiff: Diversified Financial LLC
Defendant: Rhonda Baker and Jarod Baker
Case Number: 5:2018cv01101
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diversified Financial LLC. Rhonda Baker served on 12/3/2018. (Hines, Tami)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diversified Financial LLC. Jarod Baker served on 12/3/2018. (Hines, Tami)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jarod Baker, Rhonda Baker filed by Diversified Financial LLC.(Hines, Tami)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Diversified Financial LLC . (Hines, Tami)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Diversified Financial LLC. Plaintiff Diversified Financial, LLC, shallfile an amended complaint to allege the existence of diversity jurisdiction within 14 daysfrom the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/13/2018. (mb)
November 9, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2809035. (Hines, Tami)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Tami J Hines on behalf of Diversified Financial LLC (Hines, Tami)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jarod Baker, Rhonda Baker. (ml)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jarod Baker, Rhonda Baker filed by Diversified Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Retail Installment Contract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diversified Financial LLC v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarod Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversified Financial LLC
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?