Gentry v. Fox

Plaintiff: Timothy Gentry
Defendant: John B Fox
Case Number: 5:2018cv01106
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
0 Judge: Joe Heaton
1 Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 7 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 filed by Timothy Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
January 2, 2019 6 Letter by Timothy Gentry re #4 Order, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended Plaintiffs action re #1 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice based on their failure to pay the filing fee, otherwise prosecute this action, and comply with the Courts orders. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/14/2018. (cps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 3rd day of December, 2018. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/13/2018. (cps)
November 9, 2018 3 Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/09/18. (nv)
November 9, 2018 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases. (nv)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against John B Fox filed by Timothy Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?