Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: James Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2018cv01109
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by James Wilson. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/18/2018. (Mitzner, Miles)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(dwl)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Vacating Report and Recommendation ~ The Court entered a Report and Recommendation on November 14, 2018, recommending that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs be denied and that if Plaintiff did not pay the filing fee within 21 days of any order adopting the report and recommendation, his action be dismissed without prejudice. #4 . On December 5, 2018, the Court received Plaintiff's $400.00 filing fee. Accordingly, the Court's Report and Recommendation is hereby VACATED and Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/6/2018. (dwl)
December 5, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2824191. (Mitzner, Miles)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 be denied. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that if Plaintiff does not pay the $400.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation, that this action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/14/2018. (dwl)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of James Wilson (Mitzner, Miles)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Wilson. (ac)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by James Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Miles L Mitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?