Wise v. Trimac Containment, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jordan Wise
Defendant: Trimac Containment, LLC and William A. McCaslin
Case Number: 5:2018cv01110
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Charles Scalise. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/28/18.
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2837342 by Jordan Wise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit affidavit)(Taylor, Jeffery)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffery A Taylor on behalf of Jordan Wise (Taylor, Jeffery)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua W Solberg on behalf of William A. McCaslin, Trimac Containment, LLC (Solberg, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00105.
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of Oklahoma (Shawnee Division)(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(gsalinas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Date. (Dkt. No. 13). The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. 5) is extended to November 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Oklahoma, Shawnee Div filed by Jordan Wise. (Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Third MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Transfer VenueMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Jordan Wise, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Date (Dkt. No. 11). The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. 5) is extended to October 25, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Transfer VenueMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Jordan Wise, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Response Date (Dkt. No. 9). The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. No. 5) is extended to October 18, 2018.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Transfer VenueMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Jordan Wise, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: conference set in Order #7 is hereby Cancelled. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William A. McCaslin, Trimac Containment, LLC, filed.(Vela, Oscar) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Oklahoma, Shawnee Div by William A. McCaslin, Trimac Containment, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Vela, Oscar) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to William A. McCaslin, Trimac Containment, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jordan Wise, filed.(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20514578) filed by Jordan Wise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scalise, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 11/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Trimac Containment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimac Containment, LLC
Represented By: Oscar A Vela, Jr
Represented By: Joshua W Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. McCaslin
Represented By: Oscar A Vela, Jr
Represented By: Joshua W Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Wise
Represented By: Charles L Scalise
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?