Agrawal et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Kris K Agrawal and Energy Production Services LLC
Defendant: John Doe, Tommy Tatro, Aletia Haynes Timmons, Ronald J Walker, Amy Laurent, Chris Holland, Gregory Williams, Daniel Delluomo, Jerry Parent and Acadiana Maintenance Services
Case Number: 5:2018cv01133
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amy Laurent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgment)(Heggy, Rodney)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Order filed by Amy Laurent. (Heggy, Rodney)
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment titled "Motion for Summary Judgment Against CO&G Production Group LLC, Ron Walker, Charles Brackney and Jerry Parent" by Kris K Agrawal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN CJ-2008-6839, #2 Exhibit 2 - District Court of Tulsa County Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Garnishment Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order re CJ-2008-6839, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Kris Agrawal)(kmt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment titled "Motion for Summary Judgment Against Amy Laurent and Christopher Holland" by Kris K Agrawal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Odol's Answer Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 3 - Response and Objection from State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit 4 - OK Dept of Labor Documents, #5 Exhibit 5 - Holland Financial Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion to Enter and Void the Judgment of OK Dept of Labor, #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion, #8 Exhibit 8 - OK Supreme Court Documents)(kmt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Order by Kris K Agrawal. (kmt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ronald J Walker. (Morgan, Scott)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott V Morgan on behalf of Ronald J Walker (Morgan, Scott)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/13/2018. (md)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Sanctions or to Dismiss by Amy Laurent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Attorney Fees, #2 Exhibit Motion Revoke Bond)(Heggy, Rodney)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney J Heggy on behalf of Amy Laurent (Heggy, Rodney)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Ronald J Walker served on 11/26/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Daniel Delluomo served on 11/26/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Chris Holland served on 11/26/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Amy Laurent served on 11/26/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Acadiana Maintenance Services served on 11/26/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kris K Agrawal. Tommy Tatro served on 11/30/2018. (em)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jerry Parent. (em)
November 23, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Declaratory Judgment by Kris K Agrawal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CO&G Production Group LLC and Ronald Walker are Engaged in Fraud upon Courts like Chris Holland)(ac) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/26/2018)to correct pages that were facing upside down (ac). Modified on 11/26/2018 (ac).
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Acadiana Maintenance Services, Aletia Haynes Timmons, Ronald J Walker. (ac)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel Delluomo, Chris Holland, Amy Laurent, Tommy Tatro. (ac)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Kris K Agrawal in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500070819 regarding #1 Complaint. (ac)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acadiana Maintenance Services, Daniel Delluomo, John Doe, Chris Holland, Amy Laurent, Jerry Parent, Tommy Tatro, Aletia Haynes Timmons, Ronald J Walker, Gregory Williams filed by Kris K Agrawal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Fraud of Jerry Parent, Ron Walker, Gregory Williams to Steal, #2 Exhibit 2-No Judgment f Labor Department against Energy, #3 Exhibit 3-No Judgment Against Energy Production Services LLC, #4 Exhibit 4-Memorandum Brief, #5 Exhibit 5- Chris Holland, Debra Metheny and Curtis Towert cheated the Supreme Court and the Labor Department, #6 Exhibit 6-Chris Holland Commited Perjury on Wage Claim, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agrawal et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris K Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Production Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aletia Haynes Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J Walker
Represented By: Scott V Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Laurent
Represented By: Rodney J Heggy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Delluomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadiana Maintenance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?