BAHA Resources LLC et al v. TPR Mid-Continent LLC
Plaintiff: BAHA Resources II LLC and BAHA Resources LLC
Defendant: TPR Mid-Continent LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01143
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice for Lack of Subject Matter jurisdiction Based on Diversity (Joint) by All Plaintiffs. (Albert, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 ENTER ORDER striking docket entry #10 Disclosure Statement - LLC by TPR Mid-Continent LLC, filed in error. Entered at the direction of Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 01/03/19. (wh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief In Support by TPR Mid-Continent LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit Standley Declaration, #3 Exhibit Patton Declaration)(Walters, Jay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TPR Mid-Continent LLC (Corrected). (Walters, Jay)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 STRICKEN DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TPR Mid-Continent LLC . (Walters, Jay) Stricken per Order #13 on 01/03/2019.
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer TPR Mid-Continent LLC answer due 12/28/2018.. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/12/18. (wh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jay P Walters on behalf of TPR Mid-Continent LLC (Walters, Jay)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by TPR Mid-Continent LLC. (Walters, Jay)
December 1, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAHA Resources LLC, BAHA Resources II LLC. TPR Mid-Continent LLC served on 11/21/2018. (Albert, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Albert, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John P Albert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Albert, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard L Rose on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rose, Richard)
November 21, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2816005. (Albert, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to TPR Mid-Continent LLC. (em)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TPR Mid-Continent LLC filed by BAHA Resources LLC, BAHA Resources II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAHA Resources LLC et al v. TPR Mid-Continent LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAHA Resources II LLC
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAHA Resources LLC
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPR Mid-Continent LLC
Represented By: Jay P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?