Hurt v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc et al
Plaintiff: Erin Hurt
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit, John Does, Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc, Associates 1996-2 and Total Housing LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01150
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss With Brief in Support filed by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc. (Ketter, Clayton)
December 24, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss With Brief in Support filed by Erin Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence from Vanderbilt)(Doyle, Sherry)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss With Brief in Support by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Unpublished Opinion)(McVay, Melvin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by Erin Hurt Dismissal without Prejudice of Ford Motor Credit (Doyle, Sherry)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Sherry L Doyle on behalf of Erin Hurt (Doyle, Sherry)
November 21, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2816497. (McVay, Melvin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc . (McVay, Melvin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Clayton D Ketter on behalf of Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc (Ketter, Clayton)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Melvin R McVay, Jr on behalf of Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc (McVay, Melvin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2018-1362 filed by Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc, Ford Motor Credit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Assignment of Contracts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executed Purchase and Sale Agreement dated 06.15.18 between Asso, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - State-Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc
Represented By: Melvin R McVay, Jr
Represented By: Clayton D Ketter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associates 1996-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Housing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Hurt
Represented By: Sherry L Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?