CO&G Production v. Agrawal
Plaintiff: Spoon Resources LLC and CO&G Production Group LLC
Defendant: Khrishna Kumar Agrawal
Case Number: 5:2018cv01164
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/3/19. (jw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Compliance with #2 Order to Show Cause, filed by Khrishna Kumar Agrawal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The Court orders Mr. Agrawal to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as a duplicate of Case No. WO-18-094 pending before the BAP. His response shall be filed within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/30/18. (jw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL from bankruptcy court. Bankruptcy court case number 16-11253. filed by Khrishna Kumar Agrawal. Appellant Brief due by 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Designation AP Part 1, #2 Attachment 2- Designation Part 2, #3 Attachment 3- Designation Part 3, #4 Attachment 4- Designation Part 4)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CO&G Production v. Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khrishna Kumar Agrawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spoon Resources LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CO&G Production Group LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?