Hatton v. Combs et al
Plaintiff: Paul Anthony Hatton
Defendant: Douglas L Combs, Kenneth L Buettner, Brian Jack Goree, John F Reif, Patrick Wyrick, Tom Colbert, E Bay Mitchell, James R Winchester, Barbara G Swindon, Noma D Gurich, Larry E Joplin, Yvonne Kauger, James E Edmonson and Robert Dick Bell
Case Number: 5:2018cv01219
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE (other) titled "Proof of Service" by Paul Anthony Hatton (em)
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #15 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Paul Anthony Hatton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSC Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - OSC Docket Sheet)(Lawson, Stefanie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefanie E Lawson on behalf of All Defendants (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefanie E Lawson on behalf of All Defendants (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Stay and Require the State of Oklahoma to Pay for the Cost and Expense of Preparation of State Appellate Record and Memorandum of Law in Support by Paul Anthony Hatton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CJ-2017-97, #2 Exhibit B-Summary of Case, #3 Exhibit C-Issues to be Raised on Appeal)(ml)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Anthony Hatton. Robert Dick Bell served on 12/20/2018; Kenneth L Buettner served on 12/20/2018; Tom Colbert served on 12/20/2018; Douglas L Combs served on 12/20/2018; James E Edmonson served on 12/20/2018; Brian Jack Goree served on 12/20/2018; Noma D Gurich served on 12/20/2018; Larry E Joplin served on 12/20/2018; Yvonne Kauger served on 12/20/2018; E Bay Mitchell served on 12/20/2018; John F Reif served on 12/20/2018; Barbara G Swindon served on 12/20/2018; James R Winchester served on 12/20/2018; Patrick Wyrick served on 12/20/2018. (em)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Dick Bell, Kenneth L Buettner, Tom Colbert, Douglas L Combs, James E Edmonson, Brian Jack Goree, Noma D Gurich, Larry E Joplin, Yvonne Kauger, E Bay Mitchell, John F Reif, Barbara G Swindon, James R Winchester, Patrick Wyrick. (nv)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) titled, "Plaintiff's Consent to Intervenor's #7 Motion for Leave," by Paul Anthony Hatton. (nv)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Rule 23 Class Certification, by George L Mothershed. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Notice of Class Action Lawsuit, #2 Attachment 2 - Opting Out of the Class Action)(nv)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) titled, "Plaintiff's Consent to #5 Motion to Intervene," by Paul Anthony Hatton. (nv)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene as a Party Intervenor-Plaintiff and Memorandum of Law in Support, by George L Mothershed. (nv)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 12/19/18. (mc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by Paul Anthony Hatton. (em)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Anthony Hatton. (em)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Dick Bell, Kenneth L Buettner, Tom Colbert, Douglas L Combs, James E Edmonson, Brian Jack Goree, Noma D Gurich, Larry E Joplin, Yvonne Kauger, E Bay Mitchell, John F Reif, Barbara G Swindon, James R Winchester, Patrick Wyrick filed by Paul Anthony Hatton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatton v. Combs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L Combs
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L Buettner
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jack Goree
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Reif
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Wyrick
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Colbert
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Bay Mitchell
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Winchester
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara G Swindon
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noma D Gurich
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry E Joplin
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Kauger
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Edmonson
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dick Bell
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Anthony Hatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?