Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 66.75 acres of land et al

Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs Trustee in Trust on behalf of the known Heirs of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63, Delyn Bullock, Gabriel Wayne Bullock, Occupants of Lots One (1) and Two (2), 66.75 acres of land, Monty E Tasier, Unknown Heirs of MESH-AQUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63, Oklahoma County Treasurer, Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company, Gregory Dean Nowakowski, United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Gregory Paul Walker (deceased), Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Monica J Bruno, Robert B Wolf, Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission LLC, United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Jean Walker (deceased), Thomasine B Wildcat, Kelly Y Walker, Anna J Walker and AT&T Corp
Case Number: 5:2018cv01221
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Banner on behalf of Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission LLC (Banner, Mark)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel E Bryan, III on behalf of AT&T Corp (Bryan, Daniel)
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing to appoint Commissioners is set for 2/22/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 302 Honorable David L. Russell. (jw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Tom Majors on behalf of Monica J Bruno, Delyn Bullock, Gabriel Wayne Bullock, Monty E Tasier, United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs Trustee in Trust on behalf of the known Heirs of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63, United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Gregory Paul Walker (deceased), United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Jean Walker (deceased), Unknown Heirs of MESH-AQUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63, Anna J Walker, Kelly Y Walker, Thomasine B Wildcat, Robert B Wolf (Majors, Tom)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Treasurer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assessment Screenshot)(Crawford, Gretchen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Gretchen A Crawford on behalf of Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Treasurer (Crawford, Gretchen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Oklahoma Turnpike Authority re #5 Notice (other) to Defendants of Hearing to Appoint Commissioners (Warrick, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE (other) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority to Defendants of Hearing to Appoint Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Warrick, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Oklahoma Turnpike Authority re #3 Notice (other) Amended (Warrick, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (other) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority Amended (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EOC E-339 Legal Description of Property)(Warrick, William)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #2 Notice (other), STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (nv)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 STRICKEN NOTICE (other) by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Warrick, William)
December 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2832078. (Warrick, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Oklahoma Turnpike Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint - Resolution of Necessity, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority v. 66.75 acres of land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs Trustee in Trust on behalf of the known Heirs of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delyn Bullock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Wayne Bullock
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupants of Lots One (1) and Two (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 66.75 acres of land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty E Tasier
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of MESH-AQUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma County Treasurer
Represented By: Gretchen A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Dean Nowakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Gregory Paul Walker (deceased)
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Gretchen A Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica J Bruno
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Wolf
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enable Oklahoma Intrastate Transmission LLC
Represented By: Mark Banner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior Bureau of Indian Affairs in Trust on behalf of MESH-AH-QUOT Mexican Kickapoo Allotment No 823MK 63 The Estate of Jean Walker (deceased)
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomasine B Wildcat
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Y Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna J Walker
Represented By: Tom Majors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp
Represented By: Daniel E Bryan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority
Represented By: Kelly F Monaghan
Represented By: William B Warrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?