Meadors v. Devon Energy Corporation

Plaintiff: Aubrey Meadors
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv01226
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Brooke L. Ballard, Esq., leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff; the clerk of court is directed to strike Ms. Ballard's name as counsel of record for plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/06/2019. (lam)
February 5, 2019 Docket Annotation: Please disregard Doc. #8 from the docket, as it was erroneously filed by counsel. (nv)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST MOTION for Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Petitioner by Aubrey Meadors. (Ballard, Brooke)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel of Record by Aubrey Meadors. (Ballard, Brooke)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Devon Energy Corporation. Devon Energy Corporation waiver sent on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Ballard, Brooke)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE (other) by Aubrey Meadors Amended Entry of Appearance (Ballard, Brooke)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R Mazaheri on behalf of Aubrey Meadors (Mazaheri, Katherine)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brooke L Ballard on behalf of Aubrey Meadors (Ballard, Brooke)
December 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2832020. (Mazaheri, Katherine)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Devon Energy Corporation. (nv)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Devon Energy Corporation filed by Aubrey Meadors. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadors v. Devon Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Meadors
Represented By: Brooke L Ballard
Represented By: Katherine R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?