Tillman v. Vlosich
Plaintiff: Barbara D Tillman
Defendant: Kristopher Wade Vlosich and Gwendolyn Dailey
Case Number: 5:2018cv01254
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Amer. w/Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING #5 AMENDED COMPALINT. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 01/23/2019. Copy of Order mailed to: Barbara D Tillman 8800 S Drexel Ave #1303 Oklahoma City, OK 73159 (wh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kristopher Wade Vlosich, Gwendolyn Dailey filed by Barbara D Tillman.(em)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that Plaintiff is financially unable to prepay the fees of this proceeding or give security for payment of the fees. Plaintiff is authorized to proceed without prepayment of the fees or giving security for such payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/10/2019. (dwl)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 2 SUMMONS(ES) by Barbara D Tillman. (kmt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara D Tillman. (kmt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristopher Wade Vlosich filed by Barbara D Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from EEOC)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman v. Vlosich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Wade Vlosich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara D Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?