Stockbridge et al v. Dawson et al

Plaintiff: Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge and Summer Stockbridge
Defendant: Charles Clay Dawson and Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2018cv01261
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma. (Fugitt, F)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge, Summer Stockbridge. (Gordon, Breanne)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma. (Holmgren-Ganz, Laura)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Lyman G Lenker, IV on behalf of Charles Clay Dawson (Lenker, Lyman)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Jami R Antonisse on behalf of Charles Clay Dawson (Antonisse, Jami)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Bradley Miller on behalf of Charles Clay Dawson (Miller, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 2/17/2019. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/15/2019. (md)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Summer Stockbridge. (Gordon, Breanne)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party. Summer Stockbridge added. Linda Stockbridge (next friend of S.S., a minor child) and Ray Stockbridge (next friend of S.S., a minor child) terminated. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/11/2019. (md)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party by Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma. (Holmgren-Ganz, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by William S Haselwood on behalf of Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge (Haselwood, William)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge. (Gordon, Breanne)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma. (Fugitt, F)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph M Vorndran on behalf of Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge (Vorndran, Joseph)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Breanne M Gordon on behalf of Linda Stockbridge, Ray Stockbridge (Gordon, Breanne)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by F Andrew Fugitt on behalf of Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma (Fugitt, F)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura L Holmgren-Ganz on behalf of Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma (Holmgren-Ganz, Laura)
January 2, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2838481. (Fugitt, F)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-2015-137 filed by Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit 6 - Withdrawal of Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit 7 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, #9 Exhibit 9 - Answer, #10 Exhibit 10 - Defendant's Objection to Subpoenas Duces Tecum, #11 Exhibit 11 - Response to Defendant Charles Clay Dawson's "Objection to Subpoenas Duces Tecum", #12 Exhibit 12 - Agreed Protective Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Court Minute, #15 Exhibit 15 - Motion for Leave to Amend Petition, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons, #17 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend Petition, #19 Exhibit 19 - File Court Minute, #20 Exhibit 20 - Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Petition, #21 Exhibit 21 - Affidavit of Service of Process, #22 Exhibit 22 - Response to Defendant ISD No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, #23 Exhibit 23 - File Court Minute, #24 Exhibit 24 - File Court Minute, #25 Exhibit 25 - Motion to Cancel Lis Pendens, #26 Exhibit 26 - Entry of Appearance, #27 Exhibit 27 - Answer, #28 Exhibit 28 - Journal Entry Granting in Part and Denying in Part, #29 Exhibit 29 - Agreed Motion to Substitute Real Party in Interest, #30 Exhibit 30 - Agreed Order to Substitute Real Party in Interest, #31 Exhibit 31 - Motion to Withdraw, #32 Exhibit 32 - File Court Minute, #33 Exhibit 33 - Special Entry of Appearance for Limited Purpose of Objecting to Motion to Withdraw, #34 Exhibit 34 - Motion to Withdraw, #35 Exhibit 35 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw, #36 Exhibit 36 - File Court Minute, #37 Exhibit 37 - Order, #38 Exhibit 38 - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Petition, #39 Exhibit 39 - Order Granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend Petition, #40 Exhibit 40 - Journal Entry of Judgment, #41 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockbridge et al v. Dawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Clay Dawson
Represented By: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Lyman G Lenker, IV
Represented By: Jami R Antonisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independant School District No. 115 of Pottawatomie County, Oklahoma
Represented By: F Andrew Fugitt
Represented By: Laura L Holmgren-Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stockbridge
Represented By: William S Haselwood
Represented By: Breanne M Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Stockbridge
Represented By: William S Haselwood
Represented By: Breanne M Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Stockbridge
Represented By: William S Haselwood
Represented By: Breanne M Gordon
Represented By: Joseph M Vorndran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?