Willett v. Hudiburg Auto Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Valerie Willett
Defendant: Hudiburg Auto Group Inc and Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00014
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of Valerie Willett (Richards, Kristin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Valerie Willett. (Hurst, Amber)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Valerie Willett. (Hurst, Amber)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:15 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 2/25/2019. (jw)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC.(Callaway, Jason)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hudiburg Auto Group Inc.(Callaway, Jason)
January 4, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2840065. (Deckard, Kari)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hudiburg Auto Group Inc . (Deckard, Kari)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC . (Deckard, Kari)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kari Ann Deckard on behalf of Hudiburg Auto Group Inc, Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC (Deckard, Kari)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason L Callaway on behalf of Hudiburg Auto Group Inc, Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC (Callaway, Jason)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by J Christopher Davis on behalf of Hudiburg Auto Group Inc, Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC (Davis, J)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-6682 filed by Hudiburg Auto Group Inc, Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Hammons, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA Hurst, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willett v. Hudiburg Auto Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudiburg Auto Group Inc
Represented By: Jason L Callaway
Represented By: J Christopher Davis
Represented By: Kari Ann Deckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudiburg Chevrolet LLC
Represented By: Jason L Callaway
Represented By: J Christopher Davis
Represented By: Kari Ann Deckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Willett
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?