Demos v. US Solicitor General et al
Petitioner: John Robert Demos
Respondent: President of the USA, USA, US Congress, Washington DC, US Attorney General, U.S. Solicitor General and US The
Case Number: 5:2019cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #9 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee for this action inthe amount of $400.00 within 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/26/2019. (mb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Robert Demos Mail sent to John Robert Demos (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Address) (kmt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mail sent to John Robert Demos (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Address) (kmt)
January 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTER ORDER VACATING re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/31/2019. (cps)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : It is recommended Plaintiff's Applicationfor Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re Doc. [ 2] be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/31/2019. (cps)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/23/2019. (cps)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Robert Demos (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Robert Demos. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 28th day of January, 2019. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/8/2019. (cps)
January 8, 2019 Notice of Mailing of Doc. No. #1 , #3 , #4 and LCvR5.4/Change of Address form to John Robert Demos #287455 MONROE CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX 16605 170th Dr SE Monroe, WA 98272 (ml)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Entered at the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/7/19. (ml)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (ml)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Robert Demos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Robert Demos. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. US Solicitor General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: President of the USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washington DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Solicitor General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Robert Demos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?